Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68439
Short Caption:WYNN RESORTS, LTD. VS. DIST. CT. (OKADA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:District Judge Wilson for Justice Parraguirre<br/>District Judge Dobrescu for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/03/2015 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/03/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Todd L. Bice.
07/20/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition For Writ Of Prohibition Or Alternatively, Mandamus.15-21803
07/20/2015MotionFiled Wynn Resorts Limited's Motion To File Volumes 11-17 Of Its Appendix Under Seal.15-21806
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.15-21808
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.15-21809
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.15-21810
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.15-21811
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.15-21812
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6.15-21813
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7.15-21816
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8.15-21817
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9.15-21818
07/20/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10.15-21819
07/20/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Errata To Wynn Resorts Limitied's Motion To File Volumes 11-17 Of Its Appendix Under Seal.15-21835
09/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall file volumes 11-17 of petitioner's appendix under seal.15-26440
09/01/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ, Volumes 11-17 (SEALED). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 9/1/15).
09/25/2015MotionFiled Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of Order Granting Motion to Compel Pending Writ Pursuant to NRAP 8.15-29228
09/29/2015MotionFiled Real Parties' Response to Petitioner's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of Order Granting Motion to Compel Pending Writ Pursuant to NRAP 8.15-29449
09/30/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. We have determined that expedited an answer would assist the court. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: October 14, 2015. In light of this expedited schedule, any extensions of time will only be granted upon showing of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Petitioner shall have until October 19, 2015, to file and serve any reply. Documents submitted in this matter shall be filed personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.15-29618
09/30/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Voluntary Recusal. Associate Justice Kristina Pickering hereby recuses herself from this writ proceeding based on the same concerns that led to her recusal in Okada v. Eighth Judicial Dist. Court, Docket No. 68310.15-29707
10/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Voluntary Recusal. Associate Justice Ron Parraguirre hereby recuses himself from this writ proceeding based on the same concerns that led to his recusal in Okada v. Eighth Judicial Dist. Court, Docket No. 68310.15-29792
10/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay and Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is hereby scheduled before the en ban court on November 3, 2015, at the hour of 1:30 p.m., in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.15-29847
10/02/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 3, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.15-30024
10/15/2015Petition/WritFiled Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus.15-31329
10/15/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix In Support of Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Vol. I of III.15-31330
10/15/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix In Support of Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Vol. II of III.15-31331
10/15/2015MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest Kazuo Okada, Universal Entertianment Corp. And Aruze USA, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal Volume III Of Supplemental Appendix to Their Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibit or Alternatively, Mandamus.15-31333
10/15/2015Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge Steve L. Dobrescu appointed to sit in the place of Justice Kristina Pickering.15-31367
10/15/2015Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge James E. Wilson, Jr. appointed to sit in the place of Justice Ron Parraguirre..15-31368
10/20/2015Petition/WritFiled Wynn Resorts' Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Writ of Prohibition.15-31919
10/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-32049
10/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file volume III of the supplemental appendix received on October 16, 2015, under seal.15-32541
10/26/2015AppendixFiled SEALED - - Supplemental Appendix in Support of Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Volume lll of lll.
11/03/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
11/06/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Supplemental Citation of Authority in Response to Questions From the Court At Oral Argument on November 3, 2015 Regarding Findings.15-34012
11/12/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[The Honorable James E. Wilson, Jr., District Judge in the First Judicial District Court, and the Honorable Steve L. Dobrescu, District Court Judge in the Seventh Judicial District Court, were designated by the Governor to sit in place of the Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justice, and the Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, who voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC15-34471
12/07/2015RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.15-37229
12/07/2015Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.