The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68450
Short Caption:RAMSEY VS. THE CITY OF N. LAS VEGASClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):68394
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A719406Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/05/2015 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/05/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
07/21/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-22100
07/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.15-22102
07/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.15-22104
07/27/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The petition in Docket No. 68394 is denied. Docket No. 68450: The stay shall remain in effect until further order of this court. We direct the clerk to transfer the documents in Docket No. 68394 to Docket No. 68450. We will treat Ramsey's petition as the opening brief in the appeal. Ramsey shall have 15 days from the date of this order to supplement the record. Respondent's Answering Brief due: 30 days. Reply Brief due: 10 days. Oral argument is hereby scheduled before the en banc court on October 5, 2015, at the hour of 10 a.m., in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. fn1[In docket no. 68394, real parties in interest filed a motion to "strike false and misleading factual allegations" in the writ petition, which we are now treating as the opening brief in docket no. 68450. Ramsey filed an opposition combined with a countermotion to strike portions of the motion to strike. We deny them at this time.] fn2[Docket No. 68450: The filing fee and case appeal statement are due by July 31, 2015. Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due by July 31, 2015.]15-22679
07/27/2015BriefFiled Opening Brief - Petition for A Writ of Mandamus Certiorari or Prohibition. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22687
07/27/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22689
07/27/2015MotionFiled Motion for Stay - Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) Action Necessary On July 22, 2015; Motion for Stay Pursuant to NRAP 8. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 684394PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22691
07/27/2015MotionFiled Response to Motion - Respondents Betty Hamilton, Michael William Moreno,and Bob Borgersen's Opposition to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) Action Necessary on or Before July 22, 2015 Motion for Stay Pursuant to NRAP 8. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22692
07/27/2015MotionFiled Motion - Limited Motion to Strike False and Misleading Factual Allegations In Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Certiorari or Prohibition. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22695
07/27/2015MotionFiled Joinder to Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay and Request for Expedited Decision. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22696
07/27/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner shall have 5 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why the petition should not be summarily denied because it appears that petitioner has a right to appeal from the district court order. Real parties in interest may file any reply within 2 days from the date petitioner's response is served. No extensions of time to respond to this order will be granted. Petitioner has also filed a motion to stay operation of the district court's order, which real parties in interest have opposed. We conclude that a stay pending our consideration of the responses to this order is warranted, and we therefore grant the motion. The district court's order that is the subject of this proceeding is stayed pending further order of this court. fn1[All documents submitted in response to this order shall be filed and served personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.] (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22697
07/27/2015MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause - Petitioner's Response to Supreme Court Order to Show Cause. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22700
07/27/2015MotionFiled Motion - Opposition and Countermotion to Strike False and Misleading Allegations in Real Parties in Interest City of North Las Vegas and Barbara Andolina, City Clerk's Limited Motion to Strike. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22705
07/27/2015MotionFiled Reply to Response - Barbara A. Andolina Reply to Petitioner's Response to Order to Show Cause. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22706
07/27/2015MotionFiled Reply to Response - Respondent's Betty Hamilton, Michael William Moreno, and Bob Borgersen's Reply to Petitioner's Response to Supreme Court Order to Show Cause. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22707
07/27/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Amber M. Riggio stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/18/15, 6/29/15 and 7/02/15. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 68394 PER ORDER FILED 7/27/15).15-22710
07/28/2015Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Craig A. Mueller
07/28/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/18/15, 06/29/15, 07/02/15. To Court Reporter: Amber Riggio.15-22854
07/30/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.15-23041
07/30/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, October 5, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-23104
07/31/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-23121
08/04/2015MotionFiled Motion for Seven-Day Extension of Time for Filing Amicus Curiae Brief and Accompanying Motion.15-23546
08/07/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Supplemental Record due: August 25, 2015.15-23812
08/07/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Nevada Judges of Limited Jurisdiction shall have until August 14, 2015, to file a motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae that is accompanied by the proposed brief.15-23814
08/10/2015MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Appellant.15-24103
08/18/2015MotionFiled Respondent Betty Hamilton, Michael William Moreno, and Bob Borgersen's Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Appellant.15-25011
08/20/2015MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief.15-25201
08/25/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Supplement to the Writ Petition now Identified as the Appeal Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER 08/25/15 ORDER.)
08/25/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appellant's Appendix Volume I and Volume II.15-25680
08/25/2015MotionFiled Respondents Betty Hamilton, Michael William Moreno,and Bob Borgersen's Motion to Strike Appellant's Supplement to the Writ Petition Now Identified as the Appeal Opening Brief and Request for Sanctions.15-25800
08/25/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 24, 2015, appellant filed, via E-flex, a supplemental brief in excess of 50 pages and a supplemental appendix in excess of 400 pages. Respondent Betty Hamilton, Michael William Moreno, and Bob Borgersen have filed a motion to strike the supplemental brief and appendix and for sanctions. Cause appearing, we grant the motion, in part. The clerk of this court shall strike the supplemental brief filed, via E-flex, on August 24, 2015. The court's July 27, 2015, order granted appellant leave to supplement the record, not to file what essentially amounts to a second opening brief. Respondents' motion for sanctions is denied. The Nevada Judges of Limited Jurisdiction (NJLJ) have filed a motion seeking leave to file a brief of amicus curiae. Respondents oppose the motion and the NJLJ have filed a reply. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the brief of amicus curiae received on August 10, 2015. Respondents shall have until September 9, 2015, to file any response to the NJLJ's brief of amicus curiae.15-25827
08/25/2015BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Judges of Limited Jurisdiction (In Support of Appellant's Opening Brief).15-25805
08/27/2015BriefFiled Respondent Betty Hamilton, Michael William Moreno, and Bob Borgersen's Answering Brief.15-25972
08/27/2015BriefFiled The City of North Las Vegas and Barbara A. Andolina, City Clerk's Answering Brief.15-26003
08/27/2015AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Joint Appendix Volume 1 (Part 1 of 2).15-26004
08/27/2015AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Joint Appendix Volume 1 (Part 2 of 2).15-26005
08/27/2015AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Joint Appendix Volume 2 (Part 1 of 2).15-26006
08/27/2015AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Joint Appendix Volume 2 (Part 2 of 2).15-26007
08/27/2015AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Joint Appendix Volume 3 (Part 1 of 2).15-26008
08/27/2015AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Joint Appendix Volume 3 (Part 2 of 2).15-26009
08/27/2015AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest Joint Appendix Volume 4.15-26010
09/09/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply to Respondents' Answering Briefs (Reply Brief). (PAGES 22-24 STRICKEN PER ORDER 9/25/15).15-27218
09/10/2015BriefFiled Respondents Betty Hamilton, Michael William Moreno, and Bob Borgersen's Answering Brief to Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Judges of Limited Jurisdiction.15-27318
09/10/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/11/2015MotionFiled Respondent Betty Hamilton, Michael William Moreno, and Bob Borgersen's Motion to Strike Improper Portions of Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Answering Briefs and Request for Sanctions.15-27487
09/11/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents Betty Hamilton, Michael William Moreno, and Bob Borgersen have filed a motion to strike portions of appellant's reply brief and for sanctions. We direct appellant to file an expedited response to respondents' motion. Appellant shall have until 4:00 p.m. on Monday, September 14, 2015, to file and serve a response.15-27622
09/11/2015MotionFiled The City of North Las Vegas and Barbara A. Andolina City Clerk's Joinder to Motion to Strike Improper Portions of Appellant's Reply to Respondents' Answering Brief.15-27670
09/14/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Reply Brief and Request for Sanctions.15-27761
09/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-28585
09/25/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Strike in Part and Denying Motion for Sanctions. The motion to strike pages 7-9 of the reply brief is denied. The motion to strike pages 9-14 of the reply brief is denied. The clerk shall strike pages 22-24 of appellant's reply brief. Respondents Hamilton, Moreno, and Borgersen's motion for sanctions is denied.15-29076
10/05/2015Letter/IncomingFiled Faxed Letter Requesting Cameras in the Courtroom from Dennis Neuhausel of KLAS-TV.15-30052
10/05/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
04/13/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Gibbons/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., with whom Douglas, J., agrees, dissenting. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 16. EN BANC17-12192
05/08/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-15080
05/08/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/18/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2017.17-15080