Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68460
Short Caption:O'KEEFE VS. STATE, DEP'T OF MOTOR VEHICLESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):68460-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 14OC001031BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Pro Bono Program
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/05/2018 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/05/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/22/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. In Forma Pauperis.
07/22/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.)15-22263
07/27/2015Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form (03/25/14).15-22672
07/27/2015BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement.15-22674
07/27/2015AppendixFiled Exhibits to the Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement.15-22676
07/30/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance as Co-Counsel (Brandon Price as counsel for the Respondent).15-23036
08/05/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days.15-23638
08/07/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.15-23962
09/03/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1.
09/03/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 2.
09/03/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 3.
09/03/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 4.
09/03/2015Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.15-28510
01/30/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG
02/21/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
02/21/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Review by the Supreme Court.17-05897
04/20/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Petition for Review. Answer due: 15 days.17-13083
05/02/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to Petition for Review due: May 19, 2017.17-14543
05/22/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Petition for Review.17-16955
06/27/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting Petition for Review and Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief due: 30 days. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief due: 30 days after appellant's brief is served. Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief due: 15 days after respondent's brief is served. fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC17-21288
06/28/2017Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the undersigned, Mark Gibbons, Justice, is directly related to Michael Gibbons, Judge who presided over this appeal in the Court of Appeals. The Supreme Court has vacated the decision of the Court of Appeals and granted de novo review of the district court decision. The undersigned has no bias for or against any party to this appeal. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure.17-21425
07/18/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Supplemental Brief due: August 10, 2017.17-23787
08/11/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief.17-26832
09/08/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: September 25, 2017.17-30135
09/25/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief.17-32481
10/06/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Supplemental Reply Brief due: October 24, 2017.17-34078
10/23/2017MotionFiled Stipulation and Order Extending Appellant's Time to Submit Supplemental Reply Brief Pursuant to NRAP Rule 31(b)(2).17-36340
10/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Supplemental Reply Brief due: November 3, 2017.17-37151
11/03/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief.17-37789
11/03/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/18/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We direct the clerk of this court to transfer the appendices, filed in the court of appeals on December 21, 2015, and July 14, 2016, to the supreme court's docket in this appeal.17-43645
12/18/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. (TRANSFERRED FROM COURT OF APPEALS PER ORDER ENTERED IN SUPREME COURT ON 12/18/17).17-43648
12/18/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (TRANSFERRED FROM COURT OF APPEALS PER ORDER ENTERED IN SUPREME COURT ON 12/18/17).17-43651
01/22/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.18-02885
02/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument in this matter is hereby scheduled for March 5, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.18-05708
02/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-06430
03/05/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
12/06/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., concurring. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 92. EN BANC (SC)18-907296