The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68476
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. (AYDEN A., A MINOR)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - JV1100318Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/12/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/24/2015Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
07/24/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Exhibits attached).15-22543
07/28/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition tor Writ of Mandamus.15-22836
09/11/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days after service of the answer to file and serve any reply.15-27503
10/19/2015MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time (Answer to the Petition for Writ).15-31817
10/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answer received on October 19, 2015. Petitioner shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply.15-32150
10/21/2015Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ (Answer of Real Party in Interest).15-32152
11/04/2015Petition/WritFiled To Answer of Real Party In Interest (Reply to Answer to Petition).15-33636
02/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.16-04714
04/28/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." The clerk of this court shall issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court to vacate its July 16, 2015, order in its entirety. Before: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 33. NNP16D-MD/MC/MG16-13321
04/28/2016WritFiled Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Courtney E. Leverty for service upon Judge Egan K. Walker.16-13326
05/20/2016WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Egan K. Walker on May 6, 2016.16-16004
05/23/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-16069
05/23/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter dated June 30, 2016 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 66816/(59691/68304)/66888/65193/65388/(67756/67763)/68476/63178/62720/64281 (Letter entered in 66816 as document no. 16-24439.)