Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68543
Short Caption:O.P.H. OF LAS VEGAS, INC. VS. OREGON MUT. INS. CO.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76966
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A672158Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/11/2015 / Gugino, SalvatoreSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/12/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/04/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
08/04/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-23537
08/04/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.15-23539
08/05/2015Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Margaret A. McLetchie
08/07/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).15-23819
08/11/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Salvatore C. Gugino.15-24242
08/27/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 19, 2015, at 10:00 a.m.15-26079
08/28/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-26117
09/02/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Michael Wall as counsel for the Respondent's Dave Sandin & Sandin & Co.).15-26674
09/10/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney for Appellant.15-27398
09/14/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Matthew J. Rashbrook, of the law firm of McLetchie Shell, LLC, has filed a "Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney for Appellant." Accordingly, the clerk shall remove Mr. Rashbrook from the docket of this appeal. We note that appellant remains represented in this appeal by attorney Margaret A. McLetchie of McLetchie Shell, LLC.15-27741
10/19/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-31825
10/23/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.15-32478
10/26/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.15-32568
11/12/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/31/13, 1/22/14, 8/29/14, 5/14/15, 8/18/15. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza.15-34377
11/25/2015MotionFiled Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.15-36138
11/25/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due date: January 25, 2015.15-36137
11/25/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Corrected Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 24, 2016.)15-36186
01/08/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/22/14, 08/18/15.16-00676
02/05/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix .[Second Request]16-03893
02/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 11, 2016.16-05153
04/12/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volumes 1-5.16-11386
04/12/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volumes 6-10.16-11387
04/12/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-11432
05/11/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Oregon Mutual Insurance Co.'s Answering Brief due: May 26, 2016.16-14700
05/12/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Dave Sandin and Sandin Co.'s Answering Brief due: May 26, 2016.16-14992
05/27/2016BriefFiled Respondents Dave Sandin and Sandin & Co.'s Answering Brief.16-16761
05/27/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Oregon Mutual Insurance Company Answering Brief.16-16772
06/21/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief due: July 11, 2016.16-19436
07/08/2016MotionFiled Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Appellant's Reply Brief.16-21221
07/26/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 10, 2016.16-23223
08/09/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Reply Brief (Third Request).16-24646
08/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the reply brief. Having failed to demonstrate extraordinary circumstances and extreme need, we deny the motion. Reply Brief due: August 24, 2016.16-25281
08/25/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Consolidated Reply Brief.16-26503
08/25/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/12/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.17-01269
09/14/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Douglas/Gibbons. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 60. SNP17-MD/MG/KP17-31065
10/09/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-34118
10/09/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/03/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 21, 2017.17-34118