The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68545
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. SCHNEIDER (JENNIFER)Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C295511Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/04/2015Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
08/04/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus And/Or Prohibition..15-23550
08/04/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.15-23551
11/12/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: 15 days.15-34473
01/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 12, 2015, this court entered an order directing real party in interest to file an answer to the petition for writ of mandamus or prohibition within 15 days. To date, real party has failed to file the answer or otherwise communicate with this court. Answer to the petition due: 11 days.16-00438
02/01/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 250 due: 15 days or answer to the petition or a motion for extension of time due: 11 days.16-03330
02/05/2016Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest Jennifer Schneider's Answer to Petition for a Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.16-03915
08/12/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied in part and granted in part." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus instructing the district court to strike the portion of its May 4, 2015, order that reverses Schneider's conviction." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 59. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-24994
08/12/2016WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the opinion mailed to attorney Steven Owens for service upon Judge Rob Bare.16-25086
08/17/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service with Writ of Mandamus and Opinion (Served on Judge).16-25591
08/22/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Party in Interest's Petition for Rehearing.16-25914
08/23/2016WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Rob Bare on August 17, 2016.16-26189
09/30/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]16-30491
10/25/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-33419
10/25/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.