The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68626
Short Caption:GRUPO FAMSA, S.A. DE C.V. VS. DIST. CT. (B.E. UNO, LLC)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Related Case(s):69119
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A706336Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/15/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/14/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Christopher H. Byrd.
08/14/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition.15-24686
08/14/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.15-24687
08/14/2015MotionFiled Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay Proceedings Against Petitioner Pending Resolution of Writ Petition Challenging Service of Process on Due Process Grounds.15-24688
08/21/2015MotionFiled Real Party in Interest/Plaintiff's Opposition to Petitioner's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay Proceedings Against Petitioner Pending Resolution of Writ Petition Challenging Service of Process on Due Process Grounds.15-25351
08/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Temporary Stay and Directing Answer. We temporarily stay the district court's "Order Denying Defendant Grupo Famsa's Motion for Order to Quash Service or Process and Setting Deadline to File an Answer to Complaint." Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. Cherry, J., dissenting.15-25461
08/31/2015Petition/WritFiled Answer to petition for Writ of Prhobition.15-26239
08/31/2015AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest's Supplemental Appendix in Support of Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition.15-26240
08/31/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Receipt of Copy (Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Real Party in Interest's Supplemental Appendix in Support of Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition).15-26291
09/04/2015MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion for Clarification of Order Granting Temporary Stay and Directing Answer.15-26927
09/11/2015MotionFiled Opposition to Real Party Interest's Motion for Clarification of Order Granting Temporary Stay and Directing Answer.15-27554
09/11/2015MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to Motion for Clarification of Order Granting Temporary Stay and Directing Answer.15-27661
09/14/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply to Answer to Writ Petition due: September 29, 2015.15-27809
09/18/2015Petition/WritFiled Reply in Support of Writ of Prohibition.15-28380
10/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny the motion for clarification. Cherry, J., concurring.15-29852
10/16/2015BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities to Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 11/13/15).
10/16/2015AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Supplemental Authorities to Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 11/13/15).
10/22/2015MotionFiled Motion to Strike B.E. Uno LLC's Supplemental Authorities and Supplemental Appendix Filed After the Writ of Prohibition Had Been Fully Briefed.15-32282
10/27/2015MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, Motion to Supplement Answer to Writ of Prohibition and Supplemental Appendix with Detailed Evidence of Proper Service Upon Grupo Famsa, S.A. de C.V.15-32806
11/03/2015MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion to Strike B.E. Uno LLC's Supplemental Authorities and Supplemental Appendix Filed After the Writ of Prohibition Had Been Fully Briefed.15-33561
11/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant the motion to strike. The clerk of this court shall strike the supplemental appendix and supplemental authorities filed in this court on October 16, 2015. Real party in interest's alternative motion to supplement its answer to the petition for writ of prohibition with the documents in the supplemental appendix and/or for leave to file those documents is denied.15-34683
01/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal and it shall stand submitted on the record and briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order.16-01553
04/21/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted in part." We grant the petition in part and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition instructing the district court to vacate its order denying Grupo's motion to quash service of process so that an evidentiary hearing may be held on the matter. Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 29. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-12417
04/21/2016WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Christopher H. Byrd for service upon Judge Rob Bare.16-12483
05/16/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-15231
05/16/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/23/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Service (Writ Served on Judge Rob Bare).16-19699
06/28/2016WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Rob Bare on June 16, 2016.16-20278