The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68630
Short Caption:SATICOY BAY LLC SER. 350 DURANGO 104 VS. WELLS FARGO HOME MORTG.Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Related Case(s):68435
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A688410Case Status:Remittitur Stayed
Disqualifications:PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:None for Justice Pickering<br/>None for Justice Stiglich
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:09/08/2016 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/08/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
08/17/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-24776
08/17/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.15-24778
08/18/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Michael F. Bohn. E-Payment Ref. no. 15081887957929.
08/19/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.15-25091
08/20/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:15-25196
08/25/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/09/15. To Court Reporter: Judy Chappell.15-25798
09/08/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-27180
10/09/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Andrew M. Jacobs and Kelly H. Dove of the law firm Snell & Wilmer, LLP appearing as counsel for respondent Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA.15-30762
11/05/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Case Involving Consitutional Question Where State is Not a Party.15-33815
12/18/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-38789
12/18/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.15-38792
12/18/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.15-38793
12/18/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.15-38795
12/18/2015AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4.15-38796
12/23/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Certification. The clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court certifies to the Honorable Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, that on November 5, 2015, respondent filed with the Supreme Court a notice that this appeal draws into question the constitutionality of NRS Chapter 116.15-39511
01/19/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-01768
02/18/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-05267
02/18/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-17671
08/12/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, September 8, 2016, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-25117
08/18/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authorities.16-25746
08/19/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jacqueline Gilbert and Jesse Panoff as counsel for the Appellant).16-25827
08/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-26454
08/25/2016MotionFiled Emergency Motion to Consolidate or File Amicus Brief. Nos. 68630/68647.16-26530
08/26/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. These appeals arise from different district court actions, see NRAP 3(b)(2), do not involve all of the same parties, and are at different stages of the appellate process. Additionally, the appeal in Docket No. 68630 has been adequately briefed, and oral argument is imminent. Therefore, we conclude that neither consolidation nor an amicus curiae brief is warranted, and we deny the motion. However, we note that these appeals shall be clustered based on any overlapping legal issues to insure that they are resolved in a consistent and efficient manner. Nos. 68630/68647.16-26668
09/07/2016OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal16-27790
09/08/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
11/07/2016BriefFiled Filed Notice of Supplemental Authority.16-34638
11/07/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Amended Notice of Supplemental Authority.16-34698
01/26/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter. The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Hardesty. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 5. EN BANC17-02865
02/06/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Stay Remittitur.17-04145
02/08/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion To Stay Remittitur. Respondent has moved to stay issuance of the remittitur pending filed of a petition for a writ of certiorari with the United States Supreme Court. Cause appearing, we grant the motion. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until June 21, 2017. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by June 21, 2017, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that respondent has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay will continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by June 21, 2017, the remittitur shall issue forthwith.17-04543