Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 68700
Short Caption:DR PARTNERS VS. LAS VEGAS SUN, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A715008Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Chief Justice Pickering<br/>None for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/27/2015 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/14/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
08/26/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-25880
08/26/2015OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms - Morris Law Group.
08/26/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-25882
08/27/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.15-26069
08/27/2015MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Expedite Appeal and Remove Case from Settlement Conference Program.15-26075
08/27/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge Respondent's Motion to Expedite Appeal and Remove Case from Settlement Conference Program).15-26077
08/27/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Respondent's Motion to Expedite Appeal and Remove Case from Settlement Conference Program served on Settlement Judge).15-26098
08/28/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Morris Law Group. Check No. 35782.
09/04/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Limited Response to Motion to Expedite Appeal and Remove Case from Settlement Conference Program.15-26930
09/10/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.15-27418
09/14/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated on an Expedited Basis. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 5 days transcript request; 20 days opening brief. Respondents shall have 15 days from service of appellant's opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 15 days from service of respondent's answering brief to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. Upon completion of briefing, resolution of this matter shall be expedited to the extent permitted by this court's calendar.15-27731
09/15/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-27919
09/18/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/19/15, 07/23/15, 08/18/15. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins.15-28292
09/18/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/19/15, 07/23/15, 08/18/15. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins.15-28304
09/18/2015Docketing StatementFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement.15-28382
09/25/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/19/15, 07/23/15, 08/18/15.15-29053
10/06/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-30219
10/06/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Vol. I & II.15-30220
10/21/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-32002
10/21/2015AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.15-32003
11/04/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.15-33696
11/04/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/07/2016OtherChief Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal.
03/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.16-08011
05/19/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Chief Justice, and the Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC16-15833
06/14/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-18484
06/14/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/01/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 21, 2016.16-18484