Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68710
Short Caption:PIMENTEL, III (LUIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66304
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C296234Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/06/2017 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/06/2017How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
08/27/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)15-26014
09/15/2015MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript.15-27858
09/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Recorder Lara Corcoran's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: October 21, 2015. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 10, 2015.15-28110
09/17/2015MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript Amended to Correct Requested Extension Date.15-28178
09/17/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/27/14, 04/10/14.15-28192
09/17/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/24/14, 05/01/14.15-28194
09/24/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court Recorder Lara Corcoran has now filed an amended motion requesting an extension until October 21, 2015. As Ms. Corcoran has already been granted an extension until October 21, 2015, to prepare the requested transcripts, her motion is denied as moot.15-28909
10/29/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/07/14, 07/21/14, 07/28/14, 09/08/14, 09/22/14, 09/24/14, 10/22/14, 05/04/15, 05/11/15-05/27/15, 07/17/15.15-33035
11/10/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time Motion for Extension to File FTS15-34297
11/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: December 29, 2015.15-35545
12/28/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Full Briefing Due to the Complexity of Issues and The Inability to Brief Issues Within the Page Limits Imposed by Rule 3C of NRAP.15-39790
01/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for full briefing is granted. The parties shall comply with NRAP 28, 28.2, 30, 31 and 32. Opening Brief due: 60 days.16-00984
03/11/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Two Week Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.16-07935
03/11/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: March 28, 2016.16-07938
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. I.16-09588
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. II.16-09589
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. III.16-09590
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. IV.16-09591
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. V.16-09592
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. VI.16-09593
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. VII.16-09594
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. VIII.16-09595
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. IX.16-09596
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. X.16-09597
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. XI.16-09598
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. XII.16-09600
03/28/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix, Vol. XIII.16-09601
03/28/2016BriefFiled Opening Brief.16-09602
04/27/2016MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time (First Request).16-13164
05/04/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 27, 2016.16-13970
06/27/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-20043
06/27/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.16-20104
07/27/2016MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief.16-23248
07/27/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: August 26, 2016.16-23251
08/15/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-25268
08/15/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/16/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Strike.16-25472
08/18/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Strike and Counter-Motion to Strike Portions of Respondent's Answering Brief.16-25689
08/19/2016MotionFiled Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike and Opposition to Counter Motion to Strike.16-25822
11/10/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion and Countermotion. Respondent has filed a motion to strike portions of appellant's reply brief, appellant has filed an opposition and countermotion to strike a portion of respondent's answering brief, and respondent has filed a reply to the opposition to the motion and an opposition to the countermotion. We deny the motion and countermotion but remind the parties that in resolving this matter, we will disregard assertions not properly appearing in or supported by the record.16-35136
01/24/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-02549
01/26/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, March 6, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.17-02982
02/08/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authorities.17-04593
02/08/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority On Issue I(A).17-04598
02/10/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Opening and Reply Brief or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Opening and Reply Briefs.17-04871
02/14/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-05128
02/14/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the amended opening and reply briefs received via E-Flex on February 10, 2017.17-05136
03/06/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
06/22/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, C.J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 31. EN BANC17-20698
07/06/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.17-22393
09/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 15 days.17-31969
10/06/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing.17-33947
10/06/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.17-33948
12/19/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Pickering, J., dissenting.17-43850
01/18/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-02446
01/18/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/02/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 25, 2018.18-02446