The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68789
Short Caption:SINDELAR (STELLA) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR1304037Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/16/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
09/10/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)15-27445
09/15/2015Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Judgment and Sentence filed in district court on 9/14/15.15-27851
09/23/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.15-28804
10/02/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Linda Davies stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/22/13, 09/24/13, 06/30/15, 07/01/15, 09/03/15.15-29987
10/22/2015MotionFiled Motion for 5 day Extension to File Fast Track Statement.15-32267
10/26/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 27, 2015.15-32528
10/26/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.15-32687
10/26/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume 1.15-32688
10/26/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume 2.15-32689
11/13/2015MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Respondent's Fast Track Response.15-34571
11/20/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: December 15, 2015.15-35637
12/15/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.15-38205
01/06/2016Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Filed.
06/16/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.16-18912
09/29/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 68. NNP16D-MC/MD/MG16-30272
10/24/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-33175
10/24/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/04/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 26, 2016.16-33175
02/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections on recently filed opinions. Nos. 68987/(61715/65819/66452)/66094/68434/(69611/70648)/(68523/68754/68770/68845)/(68949/68975)/69065/68033/6921817-05409