The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68929
Short Caption:GRACE (LECORY) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C297844Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/04/2016 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/04/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/2015Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/06/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-30349
10/06/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.15-30350
11/12/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: 20 days.15-34474
12/02/2015Petition/WritFiled State's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-36692
02/24/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-05960
02/29/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, April 4, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-06483
03/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-08823
04/04/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/21/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court to vacate its July 31, 2015, order concluding that the justice court lacked jurisdiction to adjudicate suppression issues during a preliminary hearing. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, C.J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 51. EN BANC16-22646
07/21/2016WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Robert E. O'Brien for service upon Judge Douglas W. Herndon.16-22651
08/15/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-25206
08/15/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/19/2016WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Douglas Herndon on September 12, 2016.16-28953