The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68948
Short Caption:DAVIS VS. DIST. CT. (DAVIS) C/W 68542Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Consolidated:68542*, 68948Related Case(s):68542
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P083867Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:None for Justice Stiglich
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/08/2016How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Anthony L. Barney.
10/08/2015Petition/WritFiled Emergency Writ Under NRAP 27(e) Petition for Writ of Prohibition and/or Mandamus Action Necessary on or before October 23, 2015.15-30546
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.15-30609
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.15-30611
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.15-30612
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.15-30613
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. Part 1.15-30621
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. Part 2.15-30623
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. Part 3.15-30624
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6.15-30634
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. Part 1.15-30659
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. Part 2.15-30660
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8.15-30661
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9.15-30662
10/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We stay the district court proceedings pending further order of this court. Within 11 days from the date of this order, Caroline shall file a supplement to the motion for remand addressing the effect any remand would have on the writ proceeding. Within 11 days from service of such supplement, Christopher shall file a single response to the motion for remand and the supplement thereto. fn2[The certification attached to the motion for remand does not contain the file-stamp of the district court clerk; Caroline shall attach a file-stamped copy of the certification to her supplement.] Nos. 68542/68948.15-32204
10/29/2015MotionFiled Supplement to Motion for Remand to the Eighth Judicial District Court. Nos. 68542/68948.15-33083
11/09/2015MotionFiled Christopher D. Davis's Response to Caroline Davis's Motion to Remand and Supplement Thereto. Nos. 68542/68948.15-34187
11/17/2015MotionFiled Caroline D. Davis' Reply to Christopher D. Davis's Response to Caroline Davis's Motion to Remand and Supplement Thereto.15-35092
12/09/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We entered a temporary stay pending our consideration of additional briefing on the motion for remand, which has now been filed. We grant the motion and remand this matter to district court pursuant to its certification for the limited purpose of allowing the district court to enter its amended order. We conclude that the appeal in Docket No. 68542 may proceed, but that these matters should be consolidated and the parties should address jurisdiction in their briefing, as set forth below. The clerk shall consolidate these matters for appellate purposes. District Court's Written Order due: 30 days. Appellant/petitioner Christopher Davis's Supplemental Opening Brief due: 60 days. Each respondent/real party in interest's answering brief due: 30 days from service of Supplemental Opening Brief and Appellant/petitioner's Reply due: 30 days from combined answering brief and answer. Nos. 68542/68948.15-37627
12/10/2015MotionFiled Motion to Stay Briefing Pending Supreme Court's Ruling on Motion for Remand. Nos. 68542/68948.15-37729
12/21/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. In light of this court's December 9, 2015, order of limited remand and setting forth an alternate briefing schedule, we deny as moot the motion of respondent and real party in interest Caroline Davis for a stay of briefing pending a decision on the motion for remand. Nos. 68542/68948.15-38992
01/05/2016Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Order Granting Motion To Amend May 19, 2015 Order and Denying Petition For Reconsideration filed in district court on 12/31/15.16-00116
01/06/2016MotionFiled Emergency Motion Under NRCP 27(e) for 1)An Order to Set Aside District Court Order 2)An Order Requiring Proper Amended Order and 3)An Order to Extend Time in which to File Supplemental Opening Brief. Nos. 68542/68948.16-00410
01/06/2016AppendixFiled Exhibits 1-8 to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e). Nos. 68542/68948.16-00411
01/06/2016AppendixFiled Exhibits 9-16 to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e). Nos. 68542/68948.16-00412
01/07/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service.16-00466
01/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant/petitioner Christopher Davis has now filed an "emergency" motion asking this court to vacate, strike, or set aside the district court's amended order; direct the district court to enter a "proper" amended order; and extend the time for Christopher to file his supplemental opening brief. We deny Christopher's motion. Nos. 68542/68948.16-00485
02/05/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. Nos. 68542/68948.16-03945
02/05/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix XI. Nos. 68542/68948.16-03946
03/07/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 68542/68948.16-07175
03/07/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol 1. Nos. 68542/68948.16-07176
03/07/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol 2. Nos. 68542/68948.16-07177
03/07/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol 3. Nos. 68542/68948.16-07178
03/08/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy (Respondent's Answering Brief, Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Volumes 1-3). Nos. 68542/68948.16-07437
03/08/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Mailing (Respondent's Answering Brief, Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Volumes 1-3). Nos. 68542/68948.16-07438
03/29/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Counsel. (Attorney Thomas R. Grover of the law firm of Goodsell & Olsen for appellant.) Nos. 68542/6894816-09738
04/05/2016MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 68542/68948.16-10653
04/05/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: May 6, 2016. Nos. 68542/68948.16-10656
05/09/2016MotionFiled Motion to Permit Late Filing of Reply Brief. Nos. 68542/68948.16-14303
05/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received on May 9, 2016. Nos. 68542/68948.16-15500
05/17/2016BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 68542/68948.16-15501
05/17/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/27/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 68542/68948.16-30008
10/11/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 8, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-31612
10/25/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-33431
10/27/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Reply Brief). Nos. 68542/68948.16-33726
11/01/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service (Reply Brief). Nos. 68542/68948.16-33924
11/04/2016BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority. Nos. 68542/68948.16-34413
11/08/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
01/26/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Appeal dismissed; petition denied." Fn1[The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Cherry/Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 4. EN BANC Nos. 68542/6894817-02864
02/09/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: February 27, 2017. Nos. 68542/68948.17-04721
02/28/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 68542/68948.Y17-06829
02/28/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Thomas R. Grover
03/01/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent in Docket No. 68542 and real party in interest in Docket No. 68948 shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve an answer to the petition. Nos. 68542/68948.17-06922
03/14/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Rehearing. Nos. 68542/68948.Y17-08592