The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68949
Short Caption:BOULDER CAB, INC. VS. DIST. CT. (HERRING)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A691551Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/06/2016 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/06/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Robert A. Winner.
10/08/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-30547
10/08/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.15-30560
10/20/2015MotionFiled Western Cab Company's Motion for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Supporting Reversal of the District Court's Decision.15-31878
10/20/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Amicus Brief (potential amici Sun Cab, Inc. dba Nellis Cab Co.) due: November 2, 2015.15-31930
11/03/2015MotionFiled Motion by Sun Cab, Inc. for Leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-33411
11/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions for Leave to File Amicus Briefs and Directing Answer. We direct the clerk of this court to file the proposed briefs and appendices, received on October 20, 2015, and November 3, 2015. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.15-34589
11/13/2015BriefFiled Amicus Brief - Western Cab Company's Amicus Brief in Support of Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Supporting Reversal of the District Court's Decision.15-34590
11/13/2015AppendixFiled Appendix - Western Cab Company's Appendix in Support of Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Supporting Reversal of the District Court's Decision.15-34591
11/13/2015BriefFiled Amicus Brief - Sun Cab's Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.15-34592
11/13/2015AppendixFiled Appendix - Sun Cab's Amicus Curiae Appendix.15-34593
12/09/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real Parties in Interest's Answer to Writ Petition due: December 28, 2015.15-37629
12/29/2015Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ (Respondent's Brief).15-39844
12/29/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Respondent's Brief.15-39845
12/31/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Potential Amicus Curiae Nevada National Employment Lawyers Association's Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Support of the Answer to the Writ Petition due: January 22, 2016.15-40243
01/05/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Potential amicus curiae Progressive Leadership Alliance of Nevada's motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of the answer to writ petition filed on behalf of real party in interest due: January 22, 2016.16-00146
01/11/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Writ Petition due: January 27, 2016.16-00835
01/22/2016MotionFiled Motion By Nevada Affiliate of the National Employment Lawyers Association for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-02226
01/22/2016MotionFiled Motion by Progressive Leadership Alliance of Nevada For Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Real Party In Interest's Answering Brief.16-02354
01/28/2016Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Responding Brief: Writ of Mandamus (Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ).16-02928
02/03/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus briefs received on January 22, 2016.16-03686
02/03/2016BriefFiled Amicus Brief of Amicus Curiae of Nevada Affiliate Chapter of the National Employment Lawyers Association.16-03687
02/03/2016BriefFiled Amicus Brief Progressive Leadership Alliance of Nevada's Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Real Party In Interest's Answering Brief and Supporting Affirmance of the District Court's Decision.16-03688
04/27/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-13246
05/04/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, June 6, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-13986
05/23/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-16116
06/06/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/01/2016MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Supplement Briefs Regarding Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-20729
07/13/2016MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Response in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Supplement Briefs Regarding Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-21884
08/09/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Petitioner has filed a motion for leave to supplement its briefs and argument. Real Party in Interest opposes the motion. No cause appearing, the motion is denied.16-24640
10/27/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petitions denied." Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 77. EN BANC Nos. 68975/6894916-33630
11/21/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-36280
11/21/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections on recently filed opinions. Nos. 68987/(61715/65819/66452)/66094/68434/(69611/70648)/(68523/68754/68770/68845)/(68949/68975)/69065/68033/69218 (Filed in Docket no. 68989, Document no. 17-05409)