The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68975
Short Caption:NEVADA YELLOW CAB CORP. VS. DIST. CT. (THOMAS)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Related Case(s):61681, 67664, 74166
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A661726Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/06/2016 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/06/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/13/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Marc C. Gordon.
10/13/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-31061
10/13/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.15-31062
10/21/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Potential Amici Sun Cab, Inc. dba Nellis Cab Co. shall have until November 5, 2015, to file and serve the motion for leave to file an amicus brief.15-32106
10/23/2015MotionFiled Western Cab Company's Motion for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Supporting Reversal of the District Court's Decision.15-32340
11/06/2015MotionFiled Motion by Sun Cab, Inc. for Leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-33884
11/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions for Leave to File Amicus Briefs and Directing Answer. We direct the clerk of this court to file the proposed briefs and appendices, received on October 23, 2015, and November 6, 2015. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.15-34578
11/13/2015BriefFiled Amicus Brief - Western Cab Company's Amicus Brief in Support of Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Supporting Reversal of the District Court's Decision.15-34580
11/13/2015AppendixFiled Appendix - Western Cab Company's Appendix in Support of Peitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Supporting Reversal of the District Court's Decision.15-34581
11/13/2015BriefFiled Amicus Brief - Sun Cab's Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.15-34583
11/13/2015AppendixFiled Appendix - Sun Cab's Amicus Curiae Appendix.15-34585
12/10/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to Writ Petition due: December 28, 2015.15-37642
12/29/2015Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ (Respondents' Answering Brief).15-39806
12/29/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ.15-39807
12/31/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Potential Amicus Curiae Nevada National Employment Lawyers Association's Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Support of the Answer to the Writ Petition due: January 22, 2016.15-40240
01/05/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Potential amicus curiae Progressive Leadership Alliance of Nevada's motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of the answer to writ petition filed on behalf of real party in interest due: January 22, 2016.16-00145
01/06/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Potential amicus curiae International Technical Professional Employee Union shall have until January 22, 2016, to file and serve the motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of the answer to writ petition.16-00404
01/11/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioner's Reply to Writ Petition due: January 27, 2016.16-00688
01/22/2016MotionFiled Motion By Nevada Affiliate of the National Employment Lawyers Association for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-02228
01/22/2016MotionFiled International Technical Professional Employee Union Motion for Leave To File Amicus.16-02233
01/22/2016MotionFiled Motion by Progressive Leadership Alliance of Nevada For Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Real Parties In Interest's Answering Brief.16-02346
01/27/2016Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Reply to Answer to Petition (Petitioners' Reply).16-02854
01/27/2016AppendixFiled Petitioners Reply Appendix.16-02855
02/04/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. We direct the clerk of this court to file amici's briefs and the appendix to amicus brief, provisionally received on January 22, 2016.16-03773
02/04/2016BriefFiled Amicus Brief of International Technical Professional Employee Union/Office and Professional Employees International Union Local 4873, AFL-CIO in Support of Respondent's Answering Brief .16-03784
02/04/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Amicus Brief of International Technical Professional Employee Union/Office and Professional Employees International Union Local 4873, AFL-CIO in Support of Respondent's Answering Brief.16-03785
02/04/2016BriefFiled Amicus Brief of Amicus Curiae of Nevada Affiliate Chapter of the National Employment Lawyers Association.16-03786
02/04/2016BriefFiled Progressive Leadership Alliance of Nevada's Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Real Parties' In Interest Answering Brief and Supporting Affirmance of the District Court's Decision.16-03787
03/17/2016BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authority.16-08427
04/27/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-13248
05/04/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, June 6, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-13987
05/05/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Elayna Youchah and Paul Trimmer as counsel for the Petitioners).16-14078
05/09/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Leon Greenberg for Real Parties in Interest Christopher Thomas and Christopher Craig.16-14500
05/23/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-16117
06/06/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
10/27/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petitions denied." Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 77. EN BANC Nos. 68975/6894916-33627
11/21/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-36296
11/21/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Issued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections on recently filed opinions. Nos. 68987/(61715/65819/66452)/66094/68434/(69611/70648)/(68523/68754/68770/68845)/(68949/68975)/69065/68033/69218 (Filed in Docket no. 68989, Document no. 17-05409)