The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69048
Short Caption:PACIFIC WESTERN BANK VS. DIST. CT. (RITTER)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A710645Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/09/2016 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:05/09/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/23/2015Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Kelly H. Dove.
10/23/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-32397
10/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.15-32398
10/23/2015MotionFiled Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Writ Review - Relief Requested by October 30, 2015.15-32448
10/27/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Petitioner's Appendix - Volume 1, and Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Writ Review.15-32816
10/28/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Temporary Stay and Directing Answer. Within 7 days from the date of this order, Darrin Badger shall file a response to the motion. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.15-32862
11/04/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Representation (Reid Rubinstein & Bogatz as co counsel for Real Party in Interest John Ritter and Darrin Badger).15-33643
11/04/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real Party in Interest Darrin D. Badger's Response to Motion for Stay due: November 23, 2015.15-33700
11/09/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Service.15-34128
11/19/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real Parties in Interests' Answer to Writ Petition due: December 14, 2015.15-35337
11/19/2015AppendixFiled Real Party In Interest's Appendix.15-35402
11/19/2015MotionFiled Response to Emergency Motion for Stay.15-35446
11/20/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply to Response to Emergency Motion for Stay due: December 14, 2015.15-35502
12/14/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to Response to Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Writ Review.15-38099
12/14/2015Petition/WritFiled Response to Petition For Writ of Mandamus (Answer to Petition for Writ).15-38102
12/22/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply to Writ Petition due: January 12, 2016.15-39238
01/12/2016Petition/WritFiled Reply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-01022
01/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Injunction. This court temporarily enjoined Badger from removing the funds pending his filing of a response. Badger has now filed an opposition to the motion and petitioner has filed a reply. Having considered these pleadings, the documents before this court, and the relevant factors, we conclude that an injunction is not warranted. The temporary injunction granted on October 28, 2015, is dissolved.16-03208
03/04/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Real Part in Interest John A. Ritter's Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Notice of Operation of Automatic Stay.16-07101
03/18/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We dismiss this petition as to John A. Ritter only. This dismissal is without prejudice to Ritter's right to move for reinstatement of his petition upon either the lifting of the bankruptcy stay or final resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings, if Ritter deems such a motion appropriate at that time.16-08700
03/31/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-10062
04/01/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 9, 2016, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-10207
04/14/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Address, Reid Rubinstein & Bogatz.16-11830
04/25/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-12817
05/09/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel (NNP16-MD/MC/MG)
07/28/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have twenty days from the date of this order to show cause as to why this petition should not be dismissed as moot.16-23530
08/05/2016MotionFiled Petitioner's Response to Order to Show Cause.16-24311
11/03/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted in part." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus instructing the district court to vacate its order quashing the writs of execution and garnishment and to proceed with a determination on the claims for exemption. Before: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Cherry/Douglas. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 78. NNP16C/MC/MD/MG16-34256
11/03/2016WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the Opinion mailed to Attorney Kelly H. Dove for service upon Judge Susan Scann.16-34288
11/14/2016WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Susan Scann on November 8, 2016.16-35392
11/29/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-36831
11/29/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.