Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69049
Short Caption:MAKI (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):30904, 63845, 66144, 67717, 67800, 78260, 78260-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR940345Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/01/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/26/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/26/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-32525
12/01/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 60 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28 (a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" Provided by the supreme court clerk.15-36374
12/15/2015BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.15-38162
12/30/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 1.15-39963
12/30/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 2.15-39964
12/30/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 3.15-39965
12/30/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 4.15-39966
12/30/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 5.15-39967
12/30/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 6.15-39968
12/30/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 7.15-39969
12/30/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 8.15-39970
12/31/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 9 (SEALED).
01/14/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-01308
03/01/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
11/17/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP16P-RP/JH/KP.16-35960
12/14/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-38725
12/14/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/21/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 15, 2016.16-38725