The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69060
Short Caption:SIMMONS VS. BRIONESClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A706955Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:10/29/2015 / Aurbach, PhillipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/18/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
10/28/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-32865
10/28/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.15-32868
10/28/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-32870
10/29/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach.15-33149
11/02/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.15-33240
11/02/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Geico. Check No. 602257903.
11/04/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-33627
11/20/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The premediation conference has not been conducted or is continued because: for the convenience of counsel.15-35499
12/10/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program.15-37783
12/11/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.15-37899
12/21/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested.15-39057
03/07/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance as Co-Counsel for Appellant (Dennis Kennedy, Sarah Harmen and Amanda Stevens as counsel for the Appellant).16-07272
03/07/2016MotionFiled Appellant Geneva M. Simmons' Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.16-07275
03/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: April 11, 201616-07278
04/07/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name (Law Office of Katherine M. Barker is now Geico Staff Counsel).16-10901
04/12/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-11265
04/12/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volumes 1-2.16-11266
04/12/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name (Katherine M. Barker has changed Law Firm name to Geico Staff Counsel).16-11332
05/06/2016MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Bried and Reply Brief (First Request).16-14250
05/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Answering Brief due: June 2, 2016. Reply Brief due: July 26, 2016.16-15406
06/03/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-17384
06/09/2016MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae of the Nevada Justice Association in Support of Respondent.16-18071
06/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus brief of the Nevada Justice Association, received on June 10, 2016. Appellant shall address both the answering brief and the amicus brief in her reply brief.16-19517
06/22/2016BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae of the Nevada Justice Association in Support of Respondent.16-19518
07/26/2016BriefFiled Appellant Geneva M. Simmons' Reply Brief.16-23140
07/26/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/02/2016MotionFiled NRAP 27(e) Emergency Motion to Stay Related District Court Action Pending Resolution of Appeal - Action Requested by August 11, 2016.16-23994
08/02/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Interested Party Government Employees Insurance Company d/b/a GEICO, Appearing Solely for Purpose of Emergency Motion to Stay.16-23995
08/02/2016Notice/IncomingFiled NRAP 26.1 Disclosure Statement for Interested Party Government Employees Insurance Company d/b/a GEICO, Appearing Solely for Purpose of Emergency Motion to Stay.16-23996
08/09/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Stay. Appellant has filed a motion to stay the proceedings in a district court case that is related to the underlying district court case, but which is not subject to an appeal or original proceeding in this court. The motion is joined by nonparty Government Employees Insurance Company. Having considered the motion and the joinder, we deny the motion for stay.16-24614
08/09/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Attorney Cliff W. Marcek, P.C.'s Notice of Change of Address.16-24687
11/18/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument.16-36088
03/02/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Pickering. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 9. SNP16P-RP/JH/KP17-07094
03/27/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-10079
03/27/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/06/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 30, 2017.17-10079