The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69065
Short Caption:KAPLAN VS. DUTRA (NRAP 5)Classification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONECase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/23/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee due.
10/28/2015Order/IncomingFiled Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada and the Honorable Gregg W. Zive, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge.15-32936
12/02/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Accepting Certified Question, Directing Briefing, and Directing Submission of Filing Fee. Opening Brief due: 30 days. Answering Brief due: 30 days from service of opening brief. Reply Brief due: 20 days from service of answering brief. Appellant and respondent shall each tender to the clerk of this court, within 11 days from the date of this order, the sum of $125, representing half of the filing fee.15-36651
12/30/2015MotionFiled Stipulation Between Appellant, David John Kaplan, and Respondent, Chapter 7 Trustee, Allen Dutra, for First Extension of Time to Submit Kaplan's Opening Brief.15-40072
01/19/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 8, 2015. Answering Brief due: March 9, 2016.16-01820
01/19/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Pay Filing Fee. Appellant and respondent shall have 5 days from the date of this order to pay his portion of the filing fee.16-01846
01/27/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $125.00 from Michael Lehners, Esq. Check No. 4601.
01/27/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing Official Transcript and of Deadlines Related to Restriction and Redaction (From United States Bankruptcy Court, District of Nevada).16-02900
01/28/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $125.00 from The Law Offices of Christopher P. Burke. Check No. 5951.
02/01/2016MotionFiled Second Stipulation Between Appellant, David John Kaplan and Respondent, Chapter 7 Trustee, Allen Dutra for Second Extension of Time to Submit Appellant's Brief.16-03297
02/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 20 days.16-05164
03/09/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.16-07571
03/11/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-07863
04/06/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Answering Brief is not double spaced and does not have 1" margins on all four sides. Corrected brief due: 5 days.16-10825
04/11/2016BriefFiled Answering Brief.16-11192
05/10/2016MotionFiled Stipulation Between Appellant David John Kaplan and Respondent, Chapter 7 Trustee, Allen Dutra, to Extend Due Date to Submit Appellant's Reply Brief.16-14553
05/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Reply Brief due: May 20, 2016.16-15411
05/20/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-15886
05/20/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/23/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.16-29586
12/01/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Question answered." Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 80. EN BANC16-37133
12/27/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-40151
12/27/2016Case Status UpdateCase Closed/No Remittitur Issued.
01/06/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Clerk, U.S. Bankruptcy Court on December 27, 2016.16-40151
02/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections on recently filed opinions. Nos. 68987/(61715/65819/66452)/66094/68434/(69611/70648)/(68523/68754/68770/68845)/(68949/68975)/69065/68033/69218 (Filed in Docket no. 68989, Document no. 17-05409)