The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69073
Short Caption:SPARKS (LAWRENCE) VS. BAREClassification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - TR017138Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: En Banc
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/29/2015Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
10/29/2015Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ Prohibition, and/or in the Alternative Writ of Mandamus; and/or Writ of Certiorari.15-33059
11/13/2015Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Supplement to Petition for Writ Prohibition, and/or in the Alternative Writ of Mandamus; and/or Writ of Certiorari.15-34637
11/13/2015Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Exhibits.15-34638
01/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 20 days. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court amend the caption to include the real party in interest as noted above.]16-01437
02/05/2016Petition/WritFiled Respondent City of Henderson's Answer to Pro Se Petition for Writ of Prohibition/Mandamus/Certiorari.16-03890
02/11/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to File a Reply to "Respondent City of Henderson's Answer to Pro Se Petition for Writ of Prohibition/Mandamus/Certiorari."16-04628
02/17/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Permission to File Papers with the Court Pro Se Pursuant to NRAP 27(b).16-05118
02/18/2016Petition/WritFiled Amended Respondent City of Henderson's Amended Answer to Pro Se Petition for Writ of Prohibition/Mandamus/Certiorari.16-05201
06/16/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Majority: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 43. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-18838
06/29/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petition for Rehearing due: July 19, 2016.16-20289
07/25/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Joint Petition for Rehearing by Petitioner and Amicus Curiae Kim Blandino of the Order Denying Relief Filed on June 16, 2016.16-23002
08/10/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "We conclude that rehearing is not warranted." NRAP 40(c).16-24823
08/18/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: September 7, 2016.16-25669
09/12/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Joint Petition for Rehearing En Banc by Petitioner and Amicus Curiae Kim Blandino of the Order Denying Relief Filed on June 16, 2016 (En Banc Reconsideration).16-28134
10/21/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. fn1[The Honorable Nancy Saitta, Justice, having retired, did not participate in the decision of this matter.]16-33085
11/17/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing.16-35866
11/17/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.