Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69074
Short Caption:THOMAS (LACY) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):52351, 58833
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C241569Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Chief Justice DouglasPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/06/2016 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/06/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/29/2015Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/29/2015Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.15-33067
10/29/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume I.15-33086
10/29/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume II.15-33087
11/05/2015OtherJustice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties.
11/12/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: 20 days.15-34472
12/02/2015MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time First Request.15-36697
12/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: January 4, 2016.15-37444
01/04/2016MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time - Second Request.16-00021
01/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real Party In Interest's Answer due: January 11, 2016.16-00548
01/11/2016Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-00849
01/11/2016MotionFiled Motion Requesting Transmittal of Exhibit Pursuant to NRAP 30(d).16-00850
01/11/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.16-00854
01/13/2016MotionFiled Request for Permission to File a Reply in Support of the Petition for Extraordinary Relief.16-01086
01/27/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Real Party in Interest has filed a motion requesting this court to direct the district court clerk to transmit original Defense Exhibit G from the jury trial below. Real party fails to explain why the contents of Exhibit G cannot be reproduced for inclusion in an appendix. Accordingly, no good cause appearing, the motion is denied. Petitioner has moved for leave to file a reply to real party in interest's answer to the petition for writ of mandamus. Cause appearing, we grant petitioner's motion. Reply due: 10 days.16-02822
02/01/2016MotionFiled Motion Requesting to Amend the Respondent's Appendix Pursuant to NRAP 30(d).16-03387
02/08/2016Petition/WritFiled Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-04173
02/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion of real party in interest to amend its appendix to include Defense Exhibit G is granted. Real party in interest's amended appendix due: 11 days.16-04523
02/16/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Amended Appendix Vol. 1.16-04855
02/16/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Amended Appendix Vol. 2.16-04864
02/16/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Amended Appendix Vol. 3.16-04865
02/16/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Amended Appendix Vol. 4.16-04866
04/27/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-13244
05/18/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, June 16, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-15664
06/06/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-17525
06/16/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Panel SNP16-JH/NS/KP.
11/03/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This case was previously argued before the Southern Nevada Panel on June 16, 2016, and submitted for decision. This court has determined that argument before the en banc court would be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on December 6, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.16-34305
11/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on Tuesday, December 6, 2016, @ 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas.16-34313
11/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-36214
11/22/2016BriefFiled Petitioner's Notice of Supplemental Authorities.16-36476
12/06/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
09/14/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus, instructing the district court to vacate its September 29, 2015, order denying the motion to dismiss and enter an order granting dismissal of the indictment. Fn1[The Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Cherry/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Gibbons, J., concurring. Pickering, J., dissenting. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 63. EN BANC17-31093
09/14/2017WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the order mailed to Daniel Albregts for service upon Judge Michael Villani.17-31103
09/26/2017WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Michael Villani on September 19, 2017.17-32660
09/29/2017MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion for Enlargement of Time (First Request) (Petition for Rehearing).17-33269
10/09/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real party in Interest's Petition for Rehearing due: October 16, 2017. The remittitur shall not issue until the time for rehearing has expired.17-34220
10/12/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Party in Interest's Petition for Rehearing.17-34721
11/29/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer To Petition For Rehearing. Answer due: 15 days.17-41024
12/14/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner's Opposition to Petition for Rehearing.17-43283
01/04/2018OtherReturned Unfiled Document "Letter to the Justice's from Scott Mitchell."18-00388
01/19/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1 [The honorable Michael L. Douglas, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Pickering, J., dissenting. En Banc.18-02612
02/13/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing.18-05851
02/13/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.