The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69169
Short Caption:MARTINEZ-HERNANDEZ (LAZARO) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Related Case(s):63650, 72069
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C230237Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/11/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/17/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/17/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)15-35089
11/17/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.15-35091
11/30/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/4/15, 10/9/15. Court Reporter: Michelle Ramsey. Filed in district court on: 11/20/15.15-36216
12/08/2015TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/04/15, 10/09/15.15-37292
12/23/2015Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.15-39395
12/23/2015AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume 1.15-39396
01/13/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: January 20, 2016.16-01098
01/20/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.16-02014
02/05/2016MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to Fast Track Response.16-03936
02/10/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track reply received via E-Flex on February 5, 2016.16-04357
02/10/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.16-04359
02/10/2016Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
07/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.16-21523
08/12/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Saitta/Pickering. Author: Saitta, J. Majority: Saitta/hardesty/Pickering.132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 61. SNP16-JH/NS/KP16-25001
09/07/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-27686
09/07/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/23/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 13, 2016.16-27686
11/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 67656/64349;64452;65497/64702;65007;65172/65562/66697/66157/67660/56329/69169 (Filed in docket no. 67656 document no. 16-34632)