Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 69210
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO M.M.L., JR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D497399Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/04/2017 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/04/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
11/20/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal.15-35552
11/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.15-35562
11/20/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.15-35564
11/24/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Family Court Cover Sheet (SEALED).
12/04/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-37020
12/23/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/10/15 and 9/21/15. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub.15-39408
01/07/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appointment of Counsel (Aaron Grigsby as counsel for the Appellant).16-00467
01/29/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/10/15 and 9/21/15.16-03126
02/02/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee. No filing fee is due for this appeal. Appellant may disregard this court's notice issued November 20, 2015.16-03442
02/03/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.16-03643
05/04/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief due: May 17, 2016.16-13937
05/18/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol I.16-15551
05/20/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-15889
06/13/2016MotionFiled Motion For Extension Of Time To File Respondent's Answering Brief.16-18336
06/21/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received on June 15, 2016. Reply Brief due: 10 days.16-19391
06/21/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-19392
06/21/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.16-19393
06/28/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief due: July 20, 2016.16-20141
08/10/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed.
11/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-35276
11/28/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, January 4, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-36752
12/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-39674
01/04/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
05/11/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the court En Banc. Author: Cherry, C.J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 21. EN BANC17-15751
06/05/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-18494
06/05/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 12, 2017.17-18494