The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69218
Short Caption:LEAVITT (TODD) VS. STATEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Related Case(s):50438, 71495
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C079346Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:DouglasPanel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/03/2016How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/20/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-35634
12/02/2015MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Leave to File Documents in Proper Person.15-36673
12/08/2015OtherJustice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
12/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 60 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28 (a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal.15-38326
12/17/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file documents in pro se and submitted a "Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form." Pursuant to NRAP 46A parties appearing without counsel may file written briefs and other papers in accordance with the rules of appellate procedure. The clerk of this court shall file the transcript request form received on December 3, 2015.15-38592
12/17/2015Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form.15-37374
12/29/2015BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief.15-39870
01/05/2016Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Memorandum to the Court.16-00157
02/03/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-26 (via FTP).16-03609
02/05/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 575-584 (SEALED).
02/05/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 2655-2657, 2659, 2694, 3244-3245, 3247, 3265-3266, 3270 and 3272-3273 (SEALED).
02/17/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/03/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal For Decision Without Oral Argument.16-06886
03/14/2016BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Amended Opening Brief.16-08036
08/11/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Expedite Appeal.16-24876
08/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion to expedite the appeal and request a resolution within 30 days. The motion is granted to the following extent: this court will resolve the appeal as expeditiously as its calendar permits.16-26827
09/16/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[Having considered the pro se brief filed by appellant, we conclude that a response is not necessary. This appeal therefore has been submitted for decision based on the pro se brief and the record.] SNP16P-RP/JH/KP.16-28925
10/03/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Lawrence Vandyke and Jeffrey M. Conner as Counsel for the Respondent.)16-30655
10/03/2016MotionFiled Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion.16-30677
12/29/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Parraguirre, C.J., Hardesty and Pickering, JJ. Majority: Parraruirre/Hardesty/Pickering. fn1[We previously issued our decision in this matter in an unpublished order. Cause appearing, we grant respondent's motion to reissue the order as an opinion, see NRAP 37(f), and issued this opinion in place of our prior order.] 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 83.16-40396
01/25/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-02757
01/25/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/10/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 30, 2017.17-02757
02/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections on recently filed opinions. Nos. 68987/(61715/65819/66452)/66094/68434/(69611/70648)/(68523/68754/68770/68845)/(68949/68975)/69065/68033/69218 (Filed in Docket no. 68989, Document no. 17-05409)