Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69224
Short Caption:OGLESBY (JEVON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67455, 67455-COA, 69224-COA, 70401, 70401-COA, 78233
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C282319Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/21/2016How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/23/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/23/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-35756
12/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 60 days.15-39297
12/29/2015Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 12/22/15. Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Modify and/or Correct Illegal Sentence Pursuant to NRS 176.555 and 193.164 (4) (RESPONSE TO SUPREME COURT ORDER DATED 12/22/2015 - C282319).15-39906
01/05/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 60 days. Appellant's Brief or Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties due: 120 days.16-00219
01/21/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal VOL 1.16-02193
01/21/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal VOL 2.16-02194
01/21/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal VOL 3.16-02195
01/21/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal VOL 4.16-02196
01/26/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED portions of the Record on Appeal; pages 525-531 (PSI Report), 657-660 and 663-665.
02/04/2016BriefFiled Proper Person Brief - Appellant's Informal Brief.16-03826
03/21/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
04/01/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.16-10290
05/17/2016Order/DispositionalFiled "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS.
06/13/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
06/13/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-18384
06/13/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/01/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 21, 2016.16-18384