Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69232
Short Caption:BEAN (JERIMIAH) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-DIRECT)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR8252Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/06/2019 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/06/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/24/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
11/24/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pursuant to SCR 250(6)(a).15-35990
12/15/2015Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on November 18, 2015 appointing Thomas Qualls as counsel for appellant.15-38190
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1.15-40304
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 2.15-40305
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 3.15-40306
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 4.15-40307
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 5.15-40308
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 6.15-40309
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 7.15-40310
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 8.15-40311
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 9.15-40312
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 10.15-40313
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 11.15-40314
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 12.15-40315
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 13.15-40316
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 14.15-40317
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 15.15-40318
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 16.15-40320
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 17.15-40321
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 18. (PAGES 110-114 SEALED).15-40322
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 19.15-40323
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 20.15-40324
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 21.15-40325
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 22.15-40326
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 23.15-40327
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 24.15-40328
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 25.15-40329
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 26.15-40330
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 27.15-40331
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 28.15-40332
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 29.15-40333
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 30.15-40334
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 31.15-40335
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 32.15-40336
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 33.15-40337
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 34.15-40338
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 35.15-40339
12/23/2015Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 36.15-40340
02/29/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.16-06386
03/07/2016Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Corrected Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on 2/25/16.16-07130
03/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 1, 2016.16-07225
04/04/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.16-10338
04/13/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 30, 2016.16-11512
06/29/2016MotionFiled Motion for Third Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.16-20389
07/06/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: August 1, 2016.16-20899
08/04/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-24190
09/22/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Jeremy Reichenberg appearing on behalf of Respondent.)16-29409
09/26/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief.16-29810
10/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: December 2, 2016.16-31349
12/05/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-37453
01/19/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.17-02140
01/31/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: March 20, 2017.17-03502
03/21/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-09317
03/21/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 6, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. for 60 minutes in Carson City.19-14733
04/22/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-17585
05/01/2019MotionFiled Request from News4/Fox 11 in Reno for Permission to Use a Video Camera During Oral Argument on May 6, 2019 at 2:30 PM. (SC)19-19122
05/02/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. A request having been made by Kendall Holcomb of News 4/Fox 11 seeking access to the Supreme Court of Nevada oral arguments for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearing to be held May 6, 2019, beginning at 2:30 p.m. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation. Kendall Holcomb of News 4/Fox 11 is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. (SC).19-19357
05/06/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC)