Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69333
Short Caption:CAIN VS. PRICE C/W 69889/70864Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:69333*, 69889, 70864Related Case(s):69889, 70864, 71548, 76381
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 11-CV-0296Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/11/2015 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/25/2017 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:The National Judicial College
Submission Date:09/25/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/09/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Matuska Law Offices. Check no. 2213.
12/09/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-37612
12/09/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-37615
12/11/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick.15-37853
12/23/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Docketing Statement due: January 12, 2016.15-39494
12/28/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 1, 2016 at 9:30 a.m.15-39787
01/05/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.16-00290
01/05/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement served on the Settlement Judge).16-00297
02/22/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel (Robert L. Eisenberg as counsel for the Appellants').16-05634
02/29/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 16, 2016 at 9:30 a.m.16-06326
03/04/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 23, 2016 at 9:30 a.m.16-07038
03/25/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 23, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. Nos.69333 & 69889.16-09555
07/07/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 69333/69889.16-21122
07/12/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. Nos. 69333/69889.16-21569
07/12/2016Transcript RequestFiled Certificate Pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(1)(C) (Certificate of No Transcript Request). Nos. 69333/69889.16-21689
10/07/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time for Opening Brief (First Request). Nos. 69333/69889.16-31332
10/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due November 9, 2016. Nos. 69333/69889.16-31334
11/04/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time for Opening Brief (2nd request). Nos. 69333/69889.16-34512
11/04/2016MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Appeals (70864 with Nos.69333/69889).16-34513
11/23/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions and Consolidating Appeals. Having considered appellants' motion to consolidate and in the interests of judicial efficiency, the motion is granted. These appeals shall be consolidated for all appellate purposes. Cause appearing, the motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. Appellants shall have until December 9, 2016, to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 69333/69889/70864.16-36595
11/30/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volumes 1-7. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.16-37061
11/30/2016BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.16-37085
12/29/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: January 13, 2017. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.16-40422
01/05/2017BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-00331
01/05/2017AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-00337
02/02/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Exceed Word Count Limit for Reply Brief. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-03798
02/02/2017AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix - Vol. 11. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-03850
02/02/2017AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix Vol. 12. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-03851
02/02/2017AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplemental Appendix - Vol. 13. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-03852
04/10/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the reply brief received on February 1, 2107. Reply Brief due: 15 days. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-11818
04/12/2017BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-12174
04/12/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.
06/26/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling Of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduling for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-21124
08/03/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, September 25, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. for 30 minutes at the National Judicial College.17-25846
08/31/2017Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Brady Johnson with the National Judicial College regarding media access for oral argument to be held on September 25, 2017. Nos. 69333/69889/7086417-29275
08/31/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings to be held September 25, 2017. Brady Johnson of the National Judicial college is designated as pool coordinator for purposes. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the National Judicial College courtroom before 10:00 a.m. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-29306
09/11/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-30407
09/19/2017BriefFiled Appellants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-31671
09/25/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. JH/RP/LS.
09/27/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response To Supplemental Authorities. Response due: 15 days. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-32787
10/12/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Response to Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-34794
10/17/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Strike Response, or Alternatively, for Permission to File a Reply to the Response. Nos. 69333/69889/70864. (DETACHED REPLY AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 10/24/17).17-35561
10/19/2017MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Strike Response or Alternatively, for Permission to File a Reply to the Response. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-35877
10/24/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We deny the motion to strike. We grant the alternative motion for leave to file a reply. The clerk of this court shall detach the proposed reply from the motion to strike and shall file it separately. Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-36522
10/24/2017BriefFiled Reply to Respondent's Response to Supplemental Authorities Nos. 69333/69889/70864.17-36524
04/12/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 26. NNP17-JH/RP/LS Nos. 69333/69889/7086418-14020
05/07/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-17330
05/07/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/21/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2018.18-17330