The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69335
Short Caption:DYKEMA VS. DEL WEBB COMMUNITIES, INC.Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A714632Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:12/14/2015 / Saint-Aubin, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/18/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/09/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Shinnick Ryan & Ransavage. Check no. 11844.
12/09/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-37620
12/09/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-37622
12/14/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert Saint-Aubin.15-37976
12/29/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-39848
12/31/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 20, 2016 at 9:00 a.m.15-40140
12/31/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled AMENDED ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Settlement Conference scheduled for January 26, 2016 is cancelled.15-40152
01/04/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.16-00007
01/05/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.16-00241
01/26/2016MotionFiled Motion To Extend Time To File Transcript Request Form.16-02586
02/02/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the transcript request form provisionally received in this court on January 26, 2016.16-03410
02/02/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 23, 2015. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez.16-03411
04/04/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Norma Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: June 23, 2015.16-10342
04/05/2016BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.16-10537
04/05/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.16-10574
04/05/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.16-10575
04/29/2016MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (First Request).16-13459
04/29/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 3, 2016.16-13463
06/06/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-17505
06/06/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplement to Joint Appendix (Volume 3).16-17506
06/23/2016BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.16-19627
06/23/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening
11/18/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument.16-36080
12/29/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before Parraguirre, C.J., Hardesty and Pickering, JJ. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 8216-40390
01/25/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-02768
01/25/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/10/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 30, 2017.17-02768