Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69400
Short Caption:NATIONSTAR MORTG., LLC VS. SFR INV.'S POOL 1, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):75890
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A684715Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:03/07/2017 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/07/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/2015Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
12/18/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-38731
12/18/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.15-38733
12/20/2015Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Darren T. Brenner
12/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.15-39235
12/23/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:15-39388
12/29/2015Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/21/15. To Court Reporter: Michelle Ramsey.15-39884
01/08/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Motion Hearing Transcripts).16-00593
01/12/2016Docketing StatementFiled Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC's Docketing Statement.16-00870
03/25/2016MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Opening Brief.16-09549
03/25/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 23, 2016.16-09562
05/16/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel (Robert Eisenberg as counsel for the Appellant).16-15267
05/18/2016MotionFiled Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.16-15527
05/25/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 22, 2016.16-16364
06/23/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-19648
06/23/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.16-19650
06/23/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.16-19651
06/29/2016BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of Appellant and in Support of Reversal of the Judgment of the District Court.16-20435
06/29/2016MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel.16-20443
07/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion To Associate Counsel. We grant the motion to associate. Mr. Johnson shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amicus curiae in this matter. Nevada attorney Leslie Bryan Hart of Fennemore Craig P.C. shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Johnson in this appeal. fn1[If oral argument is ordered in this matter, amicus curiae may only participate upon motion and at the court's discretion.]16-21121
07/22/2016MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for to File Respondent's Answering Brief for 30 Days (First Request).16-22826
07/22/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due date: August 24, 2016.16-22879
08/24/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-26408
09/23/2016MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to file Reply Brief.16-29607
09/23/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: October 24, 2016.16-29619
10/25/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-33369
10/25/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/18/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name and Email Address for Arnold & Porter LLP (Amicus Curiae Michael A.F. Johnson).17-01772
01/24/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-02538
01/26/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, March 7, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.17-02985
02/08/2017MotionFiled Motion of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency to Participate in Oral Argument.17-04608
02/13/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency to Participate in Oral Argument.17-04929
02/14/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-05131
02/14/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The Federal Housing Finance Agency, amicus curiae in this appeal, has moved for permission to participate in the oral argument currently scheduled for March 7, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Extraordinary circumstances having been shown, the motion is granted. See NRAP 29(f). In addition to the 30 minutes previously allotted to the parties, amicus shall have 5 minutes to present oral argument respecting the position of amicus. Respondent shall have an additional 5 minutes to respond to the arguments of amicus. The oral argument shall now be limited to a total of 40 minutes.17-05158
03/01/2017BriefFiled Appellant's NRAP 31(e) Supplemental Authorities.17-07010
03/01/2017BriefFiled Respondent's NRAP 31(e) Supplmental Authorities.17-07090
03/07/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
03/09/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency's Notice of Clarification Regarding Oral Argument. (STRICKEN PER 03/30/17 ORDER.)
03/13/2017MotionFiled Objection to Appellant and Amicus Curiae's Notice of Clarification Regarding Oral Argument. (EXHIBIT A STRICKEN PER 03/30/17 ORDER.)17-08293
03/16/2017MotionFiled Amicus Curiae's Response to SFR's Objection to Clarification Regarding Oral Argument (March 7, 2017).17-08804
03/17/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Response to and Request to Strike Appellant and Amicus Curiae's Clarification Regarding Oral Argument.17-08963
03/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument was held in this matter on March 7, 2017. On March 9, 2017, appellant and amicus curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency (FHFA) filed a "Notice of Clarification Regarding Oral Argument." In the notice, appellant and FHFA seek to clarify an issue that arose during oral argument. Respondent objects to the notice and requests that the notice be stricken. Alternatively, respondent provides its own response to the notice, attached as an exhibit to its objection. This court concludes that this notice of clarification amounts to an impermissible attempt to extend the oral argument beyond the time that appellant and FHFA were allowed on March 7, 2017. Accordingly, we decline to entertain the notice. The clerk of this court shall strike the notice filed on March 9, 2017, and shall strike Exhibit A, attached to respondent's objection filed on March 13, 2017.17-10623
06/22/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty. Stiglich, J., concurring. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 34. EN BANC17-20701
07/17/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-23591
07/17/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2017.17-23591