Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69458
Short Caption:GARCIA (JUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):42403, 44006, 47059, 48123, 56137, 62119, 65158, 65777, 70604, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006, 71006-COA, 80987, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
12/28/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.15-39709
01/19/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal.16-01872
01/20/2016OtherJustice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
02/01/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On January 19, 2016, appellant filed a motion seeking voluntarily dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, we grant the motion, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. SNP16-JH/NS/KP.16-03324