Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69509
Short Caption:HARRIS (AMMAR) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-DIRECT)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C289274Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/01/2018 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:10/01/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/05/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-00177
02/04/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-26.16-03796
02/08/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Sealed portions of the Record on Appeal; pages 610 - 612, 2998-3013 (PSI Report).
04/14/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (1st Request).16-11784
04/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: June 13, 2016.16-13434
06/10/2016MotionFiled Motion to Enlarge Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (Second Request)16-18191
06/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: August 12, 2016.16-19506
08/10/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Remand this Matter to the District Court for Entry of an Appropriate Order.16-24830
08/10/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request).16-24831
10/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Remand and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant has filed a motion for a remand to the district court. We deny the motion. Opening Brief due: 20 days.16-31742
11/01/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request).16-34105
11/10/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fifth Request).16-35170
11/30/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Opening Brief due: 5 days.16-37125
12/06/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Sixth Request).16-37767
12/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: December 21, 2016.16-38802
12/22/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-39849
02/17/2017MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief-60 days).17-05793
02/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 24, 2017.17-06713
04/24/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).17-13593
05/03/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the answering brief. The motion is denied. Respondent: Answering brief due: 30 days.17-14686
06/02/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time Third Request (Answering Brief).17-18480
06/06/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Notice of Non-Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time.17-18783
06/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 3, 2017.17-19600
07/03/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).17-22052
07/18/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Fifth Request) - Answering Brief.17-23855
07/19/2017Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter in Regards to Representing Self.17-24039
07/26/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motions. Answering Brief due: August 17, 2017. Appellant has filed, in pro se, a letter requesting that his counsel raise a certain issue in this appeal. Alternatively, appellant asks that he be allowed to proceed in pro se. We cannot grant appellant's request.17-24736
08/17/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-27548
10/02/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Reply Brief.17-33333
10/09/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: November 1, 2017.17-34179
11/01/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request).17-37378
11/07/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: December 1, 2017.17-38119
12/01/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-41505
12/01/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Exhibits. Within 15 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the following exhibits: Exhibits 62-77 (photographs), and Exhibit 208 (videotape).18-15703
07/19/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-27564
08/21/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, October 1, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.18-32339
09/14/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-36064
10/01/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
10/04/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.18-38956
12/27/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Cherry, J., with whom Gibbons, J., agrees dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 107. EN BANC (SC)18-910525
01/18/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Stay the Remittitur. (SC)Y19-02911
01/23/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Original State's Exhibit(s) 208 and Original State's Exhibit(s) 62-77 this day. (SC)19-03519
01/23/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)