Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69510
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. THE EIGHTH JUD. DIST. CT.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 58896, 65727, 65728, 69326, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/2016Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
01/05/2016Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-00187
01/05/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Request for Submission of Motion Regarding Rule 60B, and the Recently Submitted Writ of Mandamus, Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis.16-00190
01/05/2016Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Memorandum of News Release.16-00213
01/05/2016Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis.16-00214
01/05/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Set Aside Void Judgment.16-00222
01/05/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Order to Show Cause Why the Clerk has Not Returned Petitioner's File Stamped Copy for Recently filed Rule 60B Motion with Accompaning Writ of Mandamus Submitted the First Week of December 2015.16-00226
01/26/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Judicial Action on Petition for Writ of Mandamus, and Motion to Set Aside Void Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60b (4)16-02720
02/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner has filed a "Motion for Order to Show Cause Why the Clerk has Not Returned Petitioner's File Stamped Copy for Recently filed Rule 60B Motion with Accompaning Writ of Mandamus Submitted the First Week of December 2015," and "Proper Person Motion for Judicial Action on Petition for Writ of Mandamus, and Motion to Set Aside Void Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60b (4)." The motions seek this court's action on the petition, and petitioner's additional documents filed, will be considered in due course as the court's calendar permits. We take no action at this time.16-04565
02/23/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Order to Cause the Court Clerk to Provide Petitioner with His File Stamped Copies of Actions Filed for Petitioner's Own Records, and Order to Show Cause why the Clerk has Withheld Petitioner's File Stamped Copies.16-05757
02/23/2016MotionFiled Proper Person 2nd Motion for Judicial Action on Petition for Writ of Mandamus now Exceeding Six Weeks with Purposeful Delay to Obstruct Filing of Habeas Corpus.16-05758
03/25/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Third Motion for Judicial Action on Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Motion to Set Aside Void Judgment Pursuant to FRCP/NRCP Rule 60(B)(4) on File with Court-NRS 34.17016-09455
03/25/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Order to Exceed Copy Limit for Purpose to Litigate Habeas Petition and to File Oversize Memorandum of Points and Authorities to Serve Respondents Named Herein.16-09460
04/14/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn2[We received a number of pro se motions and documents, and we deny the relief requested.] NNP16D-MD/MC/MG16-11741
04/21/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing (Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification Regarding Petitioners Filings, and Status Check on Petitioners Motion to Set Aside Void Judgment Per FRCP/NRCP Rule 60(B)(4)).16-12610
04/29/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pend Certiorari in U.S. Supreme Court.16-13483
05/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. No good cause appearing, we deny petitioner's motion to stay issuance of the remittitur "pending certiorari" to the United States Supreme Court. The motion is not ripe; petitioner's petition for rehearing of the order denying his petition for a writ of mandamus remains pending in this court.16-14745
06/16/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).16-18969
06/24/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Judicial Action Relating to Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Denial of Petitioner's Motion to Set Aside Void Judgment Per NRCP Rule 60(B)(4) to Allow Petitioner to Proceed to Certiorari in U.S. Supreme Court.16-19889
06/28/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Certiorari in U.S. Supreme Court - Rule 60(B)(4).16-20210
07/07/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Second Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Certiorari in the U.S. Supreme Court.16-21163
07/20/2016Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. "Notice and Proof of Service as to Petitioner's U.S. Supreme Court Certiorari Filed there with Relating to Denial of Petitioners Motion to Vacate -Void- Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(B)4-Void Judgment of Affirmation and Conviction".16-22635
08/05/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed July 11, 2016 and placed on the docket as Case No. 16-5427.16-24306
08/15/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Certiorari File in U.S. Supreme Court - Docket No. 16-5427 - Notice of Obstruction to Serve Motion for Copy Limit Increase.16-25202
08/16/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Staying Issuance of Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. fn1[We deny as moot petitioner's "Motion for Judicial Action Relating to Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Denial of Petitioner's Motion to Set Aside Void Judgment Per NRCP Rule 60(B)(4) to Allow Petitioner to Proceed to Certiorari in U.S. Supreme Court," filed June 24, 2016; petitioner's "Second Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Certiorari in the U.S. Supreme Court," filed July 7, 2016; and petitioner's "Notice and Proof of Service as to Petitioner's U.S. Supreme Court Certiorari," filed July 20, 2016.]16-25357
10/18/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.16-32607
10/19/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing.16-32674
10/19/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.