Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69542
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/09/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/11/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-00703
03/04/2016Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 02/09/16. Finding of Facts, Conclusion of Law and Order (Response to Supreme Court Email dated 03/04/2016 - C156542).16-07052
03/09/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28 (a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk.16-07584
03/18/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA).16-08734
03/25/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Informal Brief.16-09510
03/28/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Documents. Added to Record on Appeal as pages: 1594 to 1603 (SEALED).
03/28/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Documents. Added to Record on Appeal as pages: 856 to 866; 3382 to 3386; 3428 to 3430; 3532 to 3536; and 3558 to 3559 (SEALED).
03/30/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-19.16-09865
05/09/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
05/13/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Third NOA).16-15086
05/19/2016Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Letter in Regards to Docketing of Case.16-15787
05/25/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a third notice of appeal and a letter informing this court that the third notice of appeal is intended to challenge a distinct legal issue than the issue intended in the first notice of appeal. He requests this court "separate these distinct petitions." Because appellant's challenges arise from the same district court case, and the entire district court record has been filed, we deny the request.16-16396
06/03/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Clarification of Order.16-17412
06/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion for clarification of our order. We grant the motion as follows. This court will consider all issues properly before it in this pro se appeal.16-18730
01/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record. Due: 30 days.17-01984
01/25/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Supplemental Record on Appeal - VOL 20.17-02733
02/17/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing In Part and Affirming In Part. The Petition was transferred to the Eighth Judicial District Court on January 27, 2016. Our Review of the record on appeal indicates that when Mitchell filed the notice of appeal on May 9, 2016, purporting to appeal from a decision on the petition transferred to the Eighth Judicial District, the district court had not pronounced a decision, either oral or written, on that petition. "We therefore dismiss that portion of the appeal." "We affirm the district court order denying the petition filed on September 30, 2015." NNP17-JH/RP/LS.17-05741
03/14/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-08462
03/14/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/31/2017RemittiturFiled Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 21, 2017.17-08462