The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69566
Short Caption:MAYO (ANTHONY) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C295313Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/13/2016 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:09/13/2016How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/2016Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/13/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus,16-01088
01/13/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.16-01094
01/13/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.16-01095
02/10/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days.16-04403
02/29/2016Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-06436
06/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-17667
08/17/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument.Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, September 13, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-25585
08/30/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-26881
09/13/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Panel Chief Justice Parraguirre presiding.
11/23/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Pickering. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre/Hardesty. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 79. SNP16P-RP/JH/KP16-36488
12/19/2016RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.16-39380
12/19/2016Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.