The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0512
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENTS TO PART V OF RULES OF PRACTICE FOR EIGHTH JDClassification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKT
Case Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:02/02/2016Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/02/2016Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Amend Part V of the Rules of Practice for the Eighth Judicial District Court.16-03445
04/12/2016Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Marshal Willick with the Willick Law Group regarding EDCRs.16-11442
04/29/2016Administrative CaseFiled Comments from April Stokes Green with Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada regarding proposed rule change to EDCR 5.18.16-13423
12/28/2016Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending the Rules of Practice for the Eighth Judicial District Court Part V. Exhibit A attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.16-40332
03/16/2017Administrative CaseFiled Order Modifying Rule Amendment. We direct the clerk of this court to modify the order filed on December 28, 2016, by replacing "5.88: in the third paragraph with "5.90"; the amended paragraph will now read: "IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the existing EDCR 5.01 through 5.90 are hereby repealed and replaced with Rules 5.100 through 5.602, as set forth in Exhibit A."17-08857