Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69737
Short Caption:IN RE: CONNELL LIVING TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66231, 67782, 68046, 71577, 72766, 72897, 73837, 74517, 75107, 75593
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P066425Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/10/2016Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
02/10/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-04441
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-04443
02/11/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:16-04495
02/11/2016MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Emergency Motion for Stay in Excess of Page Limitation.16-04552
02/11/2016MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Stay Under NRAP 27(E).16-04557
02/16/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from The Rushforth Firm PLLC. Check No. 5087.
02/18/2016MotionFiled Response to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e).16-05286
02/19/2016MotionFiled Reply in Support of Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(E).16-05482
03/02/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-06692
03/17/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.16-08582
03/29/2016Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.16-09846
04/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Stay and Order to Show Cause. Appellants have filed a motion to stay the order pending appeal. We deny the motion. Appellant's Response due: 10 days. Respondents may file any reply within 5 days of service of appellants' response. fn1[The motion for leave to file a motion in excess of the page limitation is denied as moot.]16-11927
06/01/2016MotionFiled Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to NRAP 42.16-17094
06/20/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own fees and costs. NNP-MP Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued.16-19223