Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69747
Short Caption:WATSON ROUNDS, P.C. VS. DIST. CT. (HIMELFARB & ASSOC.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64427, 65632, 72930
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A645734Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/12/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lemons Grundy & Eisenberg check no. 31695.
02/12/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-04725
02/12/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ, Vols. 1 through 6.16-04726
03/18/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.16-08625
04/11/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to Writ Petition due: May 2, 2016.16-11161
05/02/2016Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-13607
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 1.16-13611
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 2.16-13612
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 3.16-13613
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 4.16-13614
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 5.16-13615
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 6.16-13616
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 7.16-13617
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 8.16-13618
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 9.16-13619
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 10.16-13620
05/02/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answer - Volume 11.16-13621
05/09/2016MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time For Reply.16-14418
05/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition due: May 31, 2016.16-15408
05/31/2016Petition/WritFiled Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-16939
05/31/2016AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix to Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus - Vol. 7.16-16940
03/17/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition For Writ of Mandamus. After considering the petition, answer, reply, and supporting documents, we conclude that writ relief is warranted. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate the portion of its order dated December 30, 2015, holding Watson Rounds jointly and severally liable to Himelfarb for the $526,043.36 in attorney fees." SNP17-MD/MG/KP.17-08946
03/17/2017WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the order mailed to Robert L. Eisenberg for service upon Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez.17-09019
03/22/2017WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez on March 20, 2017.17-09611
04/11/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-11929
04/11/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.