The Supreme Court
of Nevada
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69920
Short Caption:NEW HORIZON KIDS QUEST III, INC. VS. DIST. CT. (GODOY)Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A707949Case Status:Disposition Filed
Disqualifications:Panel Assigned: Panel
Replacement:
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/07/2016 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/07/2016How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/08/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Felicia Galati.
03/08/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-07432
03/08/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.16-07433
03/08/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.16-07434
03/31/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.16-10033
04/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days.16-11806
05/13/2016AppendixFiled Respondents Appendix Answering Brief.16-15141
05/16/2016Petition/WritFiled Respondents, Isabella Godoy, a Minor, by and through her mother, Veronica Jaime's Answering Brief (Answer to Petition for Writ).16-15160
05/31/2016Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.16-16922
09/27/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.16-29992
10/04/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, November 17, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.16-30886
11/08/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-34871
11/17/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) Action Necessary by 1:30 P.M. on November 17, 2016. (via Fax).16-35884
11/17/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Emergency Motion And Rescheduling Oral Argument. Real parties in interest have filed an emergency motion to continue oral argument of this matter due to the illness of counsel. Good cause appearing, the motion is granted. Oral argument of this matter, scheduled for November 17, 2016, at 1:30 p.m., is hereby vacated. We direct the clerk of this court to reschedule this matter for argument on Wednesday, December 7, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. at the Regional Justice Center. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.16-35923
11/23/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.16-36598
12/07/2016Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. NNP MC/MD/MG
04/06/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 14. NNP16C-MC/MD/MG17-11412