Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 69966
Short Caption:K&P HOMES VS. CHRISTIANA TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. District Court
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/01/2017 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/01/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/15/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee due.
03/15/2016Order/IncomingFiled Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada and the Honorable Robert C. Jones, U.S. District Court Judge.16-08161
04/08/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Accepting Certified Question, Directing Briefing and Directing Submission of Filing Fee. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date the opening brief is served to file and serve an answering brief. Appellant shall then have 20 days from the date the answering brief is served to file and serve any reply brief. Appellant and respondent shall each tender to the clerk of this court, within 11 days from the date of this order, the sum of $125, representing half of the filing fee.16-11015
04/11/2016Filing FeeAppellant's Filing Fee Paid. $125.00 from The Wright Law Group P.C. Check No. 2171.
04/13/2016Filing FeeRespondent's Filing Fee Paid. $125.00 from Wright Finlay and Zak, LLP. Check No. 1141.
04/26/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-13104
04/27/2016MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief.16-13310
04/27/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 27, 2016.16-13312
06/24/2016MotionFiled Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Answering Brief and Reply Brief.16-19842
06/27/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Errata Regarding Title of Document No. 2016-19842 (Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Answering Brief and Reply Brief).16-20025
07/11/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Non-Opposition Regarding Document No. 16-19842 (Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Answering Brief and Reply Brief).16-21335
07/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received on June 28 and 29, 2016. Reply Brief due: 30 days.16-21405
07/11/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief w/Addendum. Part 1.16-21409
07/11/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief w/Addendum. Part 2.16-21410
07/11/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief, Volume 1.16-21411
07/11/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief, Volume 2.16-21417
07/11/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief, Volume 3.16-21418
07/11/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief, Volume 4.16-21420
07/15/2016BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of Respondent w/ Addendum Attached.16-22103
07/21/2016MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Mortgage Bankers Association, Nevada Mortgage Lenders Association, and Nevada Banker's Association.16-22670
08/11/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.16-24970
08/11/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/16/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the amicus brief, certificate of compliance, and appendix received on July 21, 2016, from Mortgage Bankers Association, Nevada Mortgage Lenders Association, and Nevada Bankers Association.16-25368
08/16/2016BriefFiled Brief of Amici Curiae Mortgage Bankers Association, Nevada Mortgage Lenders Association, and Nevada Bankers Association.16-25411
08/16/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance (Brief of Amici Curiae).16-25412
08/16/2016AppendixFiled Appendix Appendix Vol. I.16-25413
08/26/2016MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief Out of Time of Amicus Curiae Community Associations Institute in Support of Appellant's Brief. (Brief is attached). (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 9/29/16).16-26719
09/02/2016MotionFiled Opposition to the Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief Out of Time of Amicus Curiae Community Associations Institute in Support of Appellant's Brief.16-27478
09/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall detach the brief from the motion filed on August 26, 2016, and file it separately. Respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a supplemental brief addressing CAI's amicus brief. The supplemental brief shall consist of no more than seven pages or the equivalent type-volume limitation.16-30364
09/29/2016BriefFiled Community Associations Institute's Amicus Brief.16-30371
10/12/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Supplemental Brief addressing CAI's amicus brief due: October 28, 2016.16-31776
11/01/2016MotionFiled Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency Motion to Associate Counsel.16-33927
11/01/2016BriefFiled Respondent Christiana Trust's Response to Brief of Amicus Curiae Community Associations Institute.16-34009
11/01/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Mailing (Respondent Christiana Trust's Response to Brief of Amicus Curiae Community Associations Institute).16-34025
11/10/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Filed Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Attorney Michael A.F. Johnson of Arnold & Porter, LLP shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amicus Federal Housing Finance Agency in this matter. Nevada attorney Leslie Bryan Hart of Fennemore Craig, P.C. shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Johnson.16-35125
01/18/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name and Email Address for Arnold & Porter LLP (Amicus Curiae Michael A.F. Johnson).17-01771
02/24/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-06488
03/06/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, April 4, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.17-07476
03/08/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority.17-07901
03/10/2017MotionFiled Joint Motion to Postpone En Banc Oral Argument.17-08207
03/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Continue Oral Argument. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for April 4, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.17-08370
03/28/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 1, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.17-10207
04/17/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-12509
04/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Oral Argument. This appeal is currently scheduled for oral argument on May 1, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. To accommodate the court's calendar, oral argument in this appeal will begin at 2:00 p.m. on May 1, 2017. Argument is limited to 30 minutes.17-12938
04/20/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Document No. 17-07901.17-13054
05/01/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
07/27/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Question Answered." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Concurring: Cherry/Parraguirre/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 51.17-24928
08/21/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-27897
08/21/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.