Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69995
Short Caption:ABID VS. ABID (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):71042
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D424830Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:04/04/2016 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:05/02/2017 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/02/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/17/2016Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
03/17/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-08543
03/17/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.16-08545
03/17/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.16-08547
03/17/2016MotionFiled Motion for Transmittal of Evaluation Involving Minor Child.16-08598
03/22/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED.)
03/31/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Radford J. Smith, Chtd. Check No. 13451.
04/01/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.16-10313
04/04/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell.16-10336
04/13/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On April 1, 2016, this appeal was referred to the court's settlement program. Accordingly, we deny respondent's motion to transmit the evaluation involving the minor child without prejudice to his right to re-file it once the settlement proceedings have concluded, if necessary.16-11526
04/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court issued a notice directing appellant to file a case appeal statement. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's notice. Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days.16-11743
04/14/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.16-11779
04/22/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (DETACHED ATTACHMENT 4 EXHIBIT #1 AND FILED IT UNDER SEAL PER 10/25/18 ORDER).16-12654
04/22/2016Docketing StatementFiled Exhibits to Docketing Statement.16-12656
04/22/2016Docketing StatementFiled Exhibits Docketing Statement.16-12657
04/22/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. The settlement conference previously scheduled is hereby vacated.16-12743
04/25/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP 3E. Appellant/Respondent will not be retaining counsel for this appeal and thus the appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 10 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix; Respondent(s): 20 days from fast track statement to file fast track response.16-12900
05/02/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/09/13.16-13634
05/02/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/17/15, 11/18/15, 11/19/15, 11/11/16 and 1/25/16.16-13636
05/04/2016MotionFiled Renewed Motion for Transmittal of Evaluation Involving Minor Child.16-13931
05/10/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/09/13, 03/18/15, 06/25/15, 07/16/15, 08/10/15, 09/09/15, 11/17/15, 11/18/15, 11/19/15, 01/11/16, 01/25/16. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services.16-14687
05/18/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court the evaluation prepared by Dr. Holland on June 5, 2015, and June 22, 2015.16-15668
05/27/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Evaluation prepared by Dr. Holland on June 5, 2015, and June 22, 2015.
06/02/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement & Appendix due: June 13, 2016.16-17240
06/10/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix.16-18150
06/20/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 5, 2016.16-19248
07/07/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix Due to Technical Error in Filing.16-21158
07/07/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Lawanda Brown stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/18/15, 06/25/15, 08/10/15, and 09/09/15.16-21189
07/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix received via E-Flex on July 7, 2016. Fast Track Response due: 20 days.16-21508
07/11/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Child Custody Fast Track Statement.16-21509
07/11/2016AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vols. 1-4. (DETACHED EXHIBIT #7 (AA 107-16) AND FILED IT UNDER SEAL PER 10/25/18 ORDER).16-21512
07/11/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vols. 5-10.16-21516
07/11/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vols.11-15.16-21517
07/11/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vols. 16-17.16-21518
07/26/2016MotionFiled Motion for an Extension to File Fast Track Response.16-23101
08/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: August 19, 2016.16-25036
08/19/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Child Custody Fast Track Response.16-25800
08/19/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.16-25801
08/19/2016Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
08/25/2016MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Reply to Fast Track Response, and to File Supplemental Appendix.16-26554
08/25/2016MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Supreme Court No. 69995 and Supreme Court No. 71042. Nos. 69995/71042.16-26555
08/26/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Errata to Motion to Consolidate Supreme Court No. 69995 and Supreme Court No. 71042. Nos. 69995/71042.16-26584
08/31/2016MotionFiled Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Reply to Fast Track Response, and to File Supplemental Appendix.16-27063
09/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Reply due: 14 days. fn1[On August 30, 2016, this court entered an order to show cause directing appellant to demonstrate this court's jurisdiction in Docket No. 71042. We defer ruling on appellant's motion to consolidate these appeals pending our resolution of the jurisdictional issue.]16-27810
09/22/2016Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.16-29566
09/26/2016MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply to Fast Track Response.16-29766
10/04/2016MotionFiled Opposition to Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply to Fast Track Response.16-30820
03/09/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-07919
03/13/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Secure April 4, 2017 at 1:30 pm as the Date for the En Banc Hearing, Alternatively, Motion for an Expedited Hearing.17-08365
03/14/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Supplement to Motion to Secure April 4, 2017 at 1:30 pm as the Date for the En Banc Hearing, Alternatively, Motion for an Expedited Hearing.17-08489
03/14/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Secure April 4, 2017 at 1:30 P.M. as the Date for the En Banc Hearing, Alternatively, Motion for an Expedited Hearing.17-08532
03/14/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Oral Argument. However, appellant's request for an oral argument date of April 4, 2017, is denied. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter on the next available en banc calendar.17-08547
03/28/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, May 2, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.17-10209
04/17/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-12511
04/17/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. This court granted appellant's motion for leave to file a reply to the fast track response, and respondent has filed a motion to strike the reply on the ground that it makes arguments beyond the scope of addressing the new argument raised in response. Appellant opposes the motion to strike. Having considered the arguments of the parties, we deny the motion to strike at this time. fn1[We deny as moot appellant's motion to consolidate this appeal with the appeal in Docket No. 71042. This court dismissed the appeal in Docket No. 71042 on October 3, 2016, pursuant to appellant's motion.]17-12681
05/02/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
12/07/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Pickering. Douglas, J., concurring. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 94. EN BANC17-42098
12/07/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney.17-42191
12/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The time for filing a petition for rehearing has not expired; counsel's request to withdraw is denied without prejudice to his right to file a timely notice.17-42864
12/19/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request to Appear and Proceed in Proper Person and to File Petition for Rehearing in Excess of Word Count.17-43844
01/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall remove Radford Smith and Radford Smith Chtd. from the docket as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant shall proceed in pro se. The motion to exceed the type-volume limit is denied. Appellant offers no explanation for why an extension of time is warranted, and the motion is therefore denied. Petition for rehearing due: 11 days.18-01533
01/25/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Petition for Rehearing in Excess of Word Limit. (DETACHED PETITION FOR REHEARING AND RETURNED UNFILED PER 02/08/18 ORDER).18-03696
02/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a second motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing in excess of the type-volume limitation. The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall detach the proposed petition for rehearing from the motion filed January 25, 2018, and return it unfiled. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: 11 days.18-05293
02/27/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.18-07586
02/27/2018Filing FeeRehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Lyudmyla Antonivna Pyankovska. Check No. 126.
02/27/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Transmittal of the Complete District Court's Record (Record on Appeal).18-07587
03/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's motion for the transmittal of the entire district court record is denied without prejudice to this court's right to revisit the issue if it deems it necessary.18-09119
04/27/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).18-16099
05/15/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Entry of Order. Order Entered in United States District Court on 11/16/17.18-18458
05/15/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Entry of Order. Response to Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Judge Linda Marquis filed in District Court on 04/10/18.18-18461
05/21/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Application for Certiorari to the United States Supreme Court.18-19326
06/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Stay Issuance of Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until July 26, 2018. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by July 26, 2018, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by July 26, 2018, the remittitur shall issue forthwith.18-21698
07/03/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Seal and Strike Selected Portions of Docketing Statement and Appendix and Motion for Protective Order and Clarification of NRS 48.077.18-25235
10/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant has filed a pro se motion to seal portions of the docketing statement and appendix. The motion is granted to the following extent. The clerk of this court shall seal Attachment 4 Exhibit #1 to the docketing statement and Exhibit #7 (AA 107-16) in the appendix.18-41971
10/25/2018Docketing StatementFiled Attachment 4 Exhibit #1 to Docketing Statement (SEALED).
10/25/2018AppendixFiled Exhibit #7 (AA 107-16) of Appellant's Appendix (SEALED).
10/25/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-42160
10/25/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 30, 2018.18-42160