Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70017
Short Caption:WHEATON (SHAUNTAY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/08/2016How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/23/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/23/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-09197
03/23/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA).16-09199
03/31/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis.16-10156
03/31/2016BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief.16-10157
04/19/2016Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. "Financial certificate"16-12170
05/18/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. The clerk of this court shall strike the opening brief filed on March 31, 2016. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to either file a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32, or file the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. Respondent need not file a response unless ordered to do so by this court.16-15581
05/19/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 31, 2016, appellant filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. This is a criminal appeal and no filing fee is due. Accordingly, this motion is denied as moot.16-15778
05/25/2016BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.16-16537
06/09/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-17.16-17951
06/10/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 854-864, 3283-3287, 3295-3299, 3314-3319 and 3334-3340 (SEALED).
06/10/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1587-1595 (SEALED).
07/08/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
12/05/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.16-37482
12/28/2016Order/DispositionalFiled "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[This appeal has been submitted for decision without oral argument.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS.
01/24/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-02567
01/24/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/10/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 30, 2017.17-02567