Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70023
Short Caption:ABARRA VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):62107, 70023-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 12OC001741BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/24/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. In Forma Pauperis.
03/24/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-09308
03/24/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines.16-09310
03/30/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days.16-09936
04/21/2016Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-12491
05/13/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.16-15117
05/18/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1.
05/18/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 2.
05/18/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 3.
05/26/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Clark Leslie to Replace Charles Lehman as counsel for the Respondent).16-16657
06/21/2016BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.16-19324
08/10/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/26/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.16-26608
09/20/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS
10/18/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
10/18/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-32647
10/18/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/27/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 19, 2016.16-32647