Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70050
Short Caption:WYNN RESORTS, LTD. VS. DIST. CT. (OKADA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/06/2017 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/06/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/30/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Todd L. Bice.
03/30/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus.16-09868
03/30/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.16-09869
03/30/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.16-09870
03/30/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.16-09871
03/30/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.16-09872
03/30/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.16-09874
03/30/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6.16-09875
03/30/2016MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to File Documents PA000506-PA001209 of its Appendix Under Seal.16-09937
04/21/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the documents received on April 8, 2016, under seal.16-12437
04/21/2016AppendixFiled Appendix - Volume III (PA000506-PA000739), Volume IV (PA000740-PA000984), Volume V (PA000985-PA001209 ), in Support of Wynn Resorts, Limited's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (SEALED). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 4/21/16).
05/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Parties in Interests' Answers due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.16-14731
06/09/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answer to Writ Petition due: June 24, 2016.16-18082
06/17/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel, Steve Morris, Esq. of Morris Law Group for Real Parties' in Interest.16-19070
06/17/2016MotionFiled Motion To File Portions Of Real Parties' Answer To WRL's Petition For Writ Of Prohibition Or Alternatively, Mandamus And Portions Of The Real Parties' Supplemental Appendix Under Seal.16-19071
06/17/2016OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms - Morris Law Group.
07/06/2016MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to Redact Portions of its Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.16-20847
07/14/2016OtherChief Justice Ron Parraguirre hereby recuses himself from this original proceeding.16-21932
07/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the redacted answer and appendix received on June 17, 2016. The clerk of this court shall file the portions of the answer and supplemental appendix received on June 21, 2016, under seal. The clerk of this court shall file the redacted reply and appendix received on July 6, 2016. The clerk shall file the unredacted reply, received on July 7, 2016, under seal.16-22147
07/15/2016Petition/WritFiled Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus. (FILED PER ORDER 7/15/16).16-22159
07/15/2016AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus. (FILED PER ORDER 7/15/16).16-22160
07/15/2016Petition/WritFiled SEALED Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 7/15/16).
07/15/2016AppendixFiled Portions of the Supplemental Appendix to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 7/15/16).
07/15/2016Petition/WritFiled Wynn Resorts' Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. (FILED PER ORDER 7/15/16).16-22163
07/15/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Wynn Resorts' Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 7/15/16).16-22164
07/15/2016Petition/WritFiled Wynn Resorts' Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus (SEALED). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 7/15/16).
12/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, February 6, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-39736
01/03/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Regarding Oral Argument. Oral argument in this case has been scheduled for February 6, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. The court has also scheduled oral argument in Wynn Resorts, Ltd v. Eighth Judicial District Court, No. 70452, on that same date at 10:30 a.m. Because these cases involve the same parties, it is the court's intent that the two cases be argued together. Petitioners and the real parties in interest shall each have 30 minutes for argument, during which they shall address both cases.17-00020
01/11/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order. These cases were previously scheduled for oral argument on Monday, February 6, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Docket No. 70500 and at 10:30 a.m. in Docket No. 70452. The time for argument is hereby changed, and oral argument before the en banc court will be held on Monday, February 6, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. for Docket No. 70500 and 10:00 a.m. in Docket No. 70452. Nos. 70050/70452.17-00988
01/24/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-02542
01/24/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Amend Volume II of Appendix in Support of Wynn Resorts' Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.17-02677
02/03/2017Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Las Vegas Review Journal's Requesting Permission for Photo and Video Coverage of Oral Argument being Held February 6, 2017.17-04012
02/03/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Sean Whaley of the Las Vegas Review Journal is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 9:30 a.m.17-04028
02/06/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/07/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the amendment to Volume II of the appendix received on January 26, 2017.17-04356
02/07/2017AppendixFiled Amendment to Appendix in Support of Wynn Resorts' Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus Volume ll of Vl.17-04357
05/08/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion To Extend The District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition And Rule 27(e) Emergency Motion For Interim Extension Of Stay.17-15062
05/08/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Aruze Parties's Notice of Intent to Oppose Wynn Resorts Limited's Motion to Extend the District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27 (e) Emergency Motion for Interim Extension of Stay.17-15073
05/16/2017MotionFiled Aruze Parties's Opposition to Wynn Reports Limited's Motion to Extend the District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 24(e) Emergency Motion for Interim Extension of Stay.17-16275
05/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Filed Order Granting Stay. The district court's March 24, 2016, "Order Granting in Part Defendants' Motion to compel Wynn Resorts, Limited to Produce Brownstein Hyatt Documents" shall be stayed pending further order of this court.17-16424
06/29/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address (Morris Law Group).17-21695
07/27/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted (Docket No. 70050); and petition granted in part, with instructions (Docket No. 70452)." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition precluding the district court from compelling the production of the attorney-client privileged Brownstein Hyatt documents (Docket no. 70050). We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition directing the district court to consider, consistent with this opinion, whether the work-product privilege applies (Docket no. 70452). Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Concurring: Cherry/Hardesty/Douglas/Gibbons/Stiglich. fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering and the Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justices, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. Nos. 70050/70452.17-24941
07/27/2017WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the order mailed to Todd Bice for service upon Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez.17-24998
08/07/2017WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez on August 1, 2017.17-26132
08/14/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Party in Interest's Petition for Limited Rehearing to Clarify Scope of the Business Judgment Rule in Nevada.17-27128
08/14/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Steve L. Morris
08/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Petitioner's Answer due: September 11, 2017.17-28626
09/08/2017MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief.17-30268
09/11/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus brief received via E-Flex on September 8, 2017. Petitioner shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answer to the rehearing petition that includes any response to the amicus brief.17-30336
09/11/2017BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief of Elaine P. Wynn.17-30337
09/12/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Erratum to Elaine P. Wynn's Amicus Brief.17-30646
09/13/2017AppendixFiled Appendix of Amicus Curiae Elaine P. Wynn.17-30763
09/19/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner's Response to (1) Petition for Limited Rehearing to Clarify Scope of the Business Judgment Rule in Nevada and (2) Amicus Curiae Brief of Elaine P. Wynn.17-31536
09/28/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).17-32975
10/23/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing.17-36294
10/23/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.