Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70069
Short Caption:STEWART (TOMMY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C305984Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/24/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/04/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/04/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-10439
05/25/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-16444
06/28/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.16-20196
06/30/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/14/16, 03/15/16, 03/16/16, 03/17/16. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen.16-20482
07/01/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.16-20606
07/18/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder. Susan Schofield stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/14/16 and 3/15/16.16-22297
08/18/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-25700
08/26/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.16-26614
09/15/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.16-28715
09/15/2016AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.16-28716
11/01/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No Reply Filed.
02/24/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.17-06601
05/04/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Douglas/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 20. SNP17-MD/MG/KP17-14812
05/30/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-17858
05/30/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 12, 2017.17-17858