Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70083
Short Caption:VALLEY HEALTH SYS., LLC VS. ESTATE OF JANE DOE C/W 71045Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:70083*, 71045Related Case(s):67886, 71045
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A595780Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:04/12/2016 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:07/18/2017 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:09/21/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/05/2016Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
04/05/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.16-10605
04/05/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.16-10607
04/06/2016Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Dennis L Kennedy
04/07/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.16-10966
04/08/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Minutes.16-11000
04/12/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.16-11431
04/25/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program.16-12943
04/27/2016Docketing StatementFiled Appellants' Joint Docketing Statement.16-13274
05/02/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.16-13627
05/12/2016MotionFiled Motion for Guidance and/or Motion to Dismiss the Estate of Jane Doe.16-15004
05/17/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/28/15, 12/07/15. To Court Reporter: Elsa Amoroso and JoAnn Melendez.16-15512
05/24/2016MotionFiled Appellants' Limited Response to Motion for Guidance and/or Motion to Dismiss the Estate of Jane Doe.16-16217
05/25/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Elsa Amoroso stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/07/15.16-16431
07/28/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 15, 2016.16-23477
08/16/2016BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.16-25336
08/16/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 1-4.16-25338
08/16/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 5-7.16-25344
08/16/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 8-10.16-25345
08/16/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 11-12.16-25347
08/16/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 13-15.16-25348
08/16/2016AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 16-17.16-25349
08/18/2016MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 70083/71045.16-25682
09/14/2016MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.16-28538
09/14/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: October 17, 2016.16-28541
09/23/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Consolidate. We grant appellants' and petitioners' motion and hereby consolidate these matters for purposes of disposition only. The matters shall be separately briefed according to the currently ordered briefing schedule. Nos. 70083/71045.16-29587
10/04/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Ketan Bhirud as counsel for the Respondent Hon. Richard Scotti (71045)). Nos. 70083/71045.16-30844
10/05/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent in Docket No. 71045 Answer to Writ Petition due: October 31, 2016. Nos. 70083/71045.16-30960
10/18/2016Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ (71045). Nos. 70083/71045.16-32530
10/18/2016BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief (70083). Nos. 70083/71045.16-32531
11/01/2016Petition/WritFiled Respondent Hon. Richard Scotti's Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (71045). Nos. 70083/71045.16-34038
11/02/2016MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File: (1) Appellants' Reply Brief; and (2) Petitioners' Reply Brief. Nos. 70083/71045.16-34250
11/07/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellants and petitioners shall have until December 15, 2016, to file and serve the replies. Nos. 70083/71045.16-34757
12/01/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent in Docket No. 70083 has filed a motion for clarification or to dismiss the estate of Jane Doe from the appeal on the ground that the estate does not have a position against appellants. Appellants have filed a response concurring that respondent does not have a reason to participate in the appeal. Having considered the motion and response, we clarify as follows. Respondent has filed its response to appellants' opening brief and shall remain a party to the appeal in Docket No. 70083. Nos. 70083/71045.16-37177
12/15/2016Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (No. 71045). Nos. 70083/71045.16-38999
04/25/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 70083/71045.17-13615
05/23/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, July 18, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.17-17183
06/30/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-21884
07/05/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument. Assistant Solicitor General appearing as counsel for The Honorable Richard Scotti, District Judge.17-22127
07/07/2017BriefFiled Notice of Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 70083/71045.17-22473
07/07/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument. Dennis L. Kennedy of Bailey Kennedy will appear on behalf of Appellants Valley Health System, LLC.17-22586
07/07/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Robert Murdock to argue on behalf of the Real Party in Interest Misty Peterson). Nos. 70083/71045.17-22630
07/18/2017Case Status UpdateOral Argument held this day (not submitted). "Before the En Banc Court."
07/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. This order is directed solely to appellant in docket no. 70083. Appellant's supplemental brief due: 20 days. Nos. 70083/71045.17-23931
07/25/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief. Nos. 70083/71045.17-24727
08/07/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's Supplemental Brief due: September 7, 2017. Nos. 70083/71045.17-26190
09/07/2017BriefFiled Appellants' Supplemental Brief. Nos. 70083/71045.17-30102
09/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 70083/71045.17-31936
09/27/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Appeal affirmed in Docket No. 70083; petition denied in Docket No. 71045." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Parraguirre/Pickering/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 76. EN BANC Nos. 70083/7104518-37761
10/01/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Correcting Opinion. The clerk of this court is directed to correct, in the advance opinion, the sentence beginning on page 20 and continuing through the second line on page 21 of this court's opinion to read as follows: The District Court Judge argues that the notice requirement was satisfied here because Hall Prangle knew that the district court would consider its conduct in its Young analysis and Doe accused Hall Prangle of violating RPC 3.3(a)(1) during litigation. Nos. 70083/71045.18-38282
10/16/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Universal Health Services, Inc.'s Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 70083/71045.18-40523
10/16/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Dennis L. Kennedy. Nos. 70083/71045.
10/18/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Universal Health Services, Inc.'s Supplement to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 70083/71045.18-41000
11/09/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 70083/71045. (SC)18-903609