Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70348
Short Caption:YU VS. YUCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):70348-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D478791Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/09/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of F. Peter James. Check no. 1389.
05/09/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-14464
05/09/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days.16-14468
05/09/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED).
05/24/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement: Civil Appeals.16-16332
05/24/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/18/14, 7/25/14, 8/22/14, 8/17/14, 11/30/15, and 2/01/16. To Court Reporter: Sherry Justice.16-16335
06/15/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing and the preparation of transcripts are suspended pending further order of this court.16-18736
07/15/2016MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause.16-22134
07/22/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Certificate of Service. Transcripts served on respondent.16-22870
07/25/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Transcript Video Services stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/18/14, 7/25/14, 8/22/14, 8/17/14, 11/30/15, and 2/01/16.16-23081
08/01/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Response to Order to Show Cause. (Reply to Response to OSC)16-23760
08/25/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Receipt of Copy (Response to Order to Show Cause.)16-26521
12/15/2016Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Respondent's Petition for Stay."16-38950
12/21/2016Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Respondent's Application to Shorten the Process of Respondent's Petition for Stay (Document No: 16-38950) Submitted on December 12, 2016."16-39724
01/04/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay.17-00068
01/06/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Respondent's Certificate of Service (Petition for Stay and Application to Shorten the Process of Respondent's Petition for Stay).17-00522
01/27/2017MotionFiled Request for Submission (Emergency Motion for Stay.)17-03031
02/02/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Stay.17-03895
02/07/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Stay and Opposition to Request for Submission.17-04370
02/08/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Stay. fn1[Given this order, we take no action on respondent's motion to expedite the resolution of the stay motion.]17-04463
07/07/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Appellant.17-22629
07/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk shall remove F. Peter James and the Law Offices of F. Peter James from the docket of this appeal. This appeal shall proceed with appellant in pro se, unless and until he retains new counsel and causes counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court.17-24299
11/22/2017Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Appeal may proceed." Brian shall have 30 days from the date of this opinion to file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. Before: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 90. NNP17-JH/RP/LS17-40349
12/22/2017BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.17-44287
01/05/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Answering Brief (Oppose Brian's "Appellant's Informal Brief.")18-00743
02/21/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed.
03/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days.18-08506
03/26/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1-10 (Via FTP).18-11625
03/29/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 4-11, 61-66, 495, 702-703 and 1557-1566 (SEALED).
04/19/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.18-15018
09/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG
10/09/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
10/09/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-39560
10/09/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/02/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 16, 2018.18-39560