Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70401
Short Caption:OGLESBY (JEVON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):67455, 67455-COA, 69224, 69224-COA, 70401-COA, 78233
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C282319Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/01/2016How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/17/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
05/17/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Fast track notice issued to trial counsel.)16-15420
05/17/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.16-15423
05/31/2016MotionFiled Motion to Clarify and Correct the Attorney of Record.16-16852
06/16/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Redesignating Appeal and Directing Transmission of Record. The clerk of this court shall remove Rochelle T. Nguyen as counsel for appellant, and redesignate this appeal as a pro se appeal. The parties shall disregard the briefing notices issued by this court on May 17, 2016. Record due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28 (a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" Provided by the supreme court clerk. fn1[ In light of this order, the motion filed on May 31, 2016, is denied as moot.]16-18892
07/01/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 1.16-20663
07/01/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 2.16-20664
07/01/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 3.16-20665
07/01/2016Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vol. 4.16-20666
07/08/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled SEALED portions of the Record on Appeal pages; 525 -531 (PSI Report) 659-662, and 665-667.
11/01/2016Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
11/09/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.16-35021
12/14/2016Order/DispositionalFiled "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn1[This appeal has been submitted for decision without oral argument and we conclude the record is sufficient for our review and briefing is unwarranted.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS.
01/10/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
01/10/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-00822
01/10/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/03/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 18, 2017.17-00822