Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70452
Short Caption:WYNN RESORTS, LTD. VS. DIST. CT. (OKADA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/06/2017 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/06/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2016Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Todd L. Bice.
05/25/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.16-16367
05/25/2016OtherChief Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges-Wright Stanish & Winckler.
05/25/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.16-16369
05/25/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.16-16374
05/25/2016MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to Redact Portions of its Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.16-16381
05/25/2016MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to File Documents APP_0377-APP_0721 of its Appendix Under Seal.16-16383
07/11/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the unredacted petition and volumes III and IV of the appendix to the petition received on June 2, 2016.16-21346
07/11/2016Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition of Mandamus. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 7/11/16).
07/11/2016AppendixFiled Received Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume III of IV. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 7/11/16).
07/11/2016AppendixFiled Received Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume IV of IV. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 7/11/16).
07/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 30 days.16-21639
08/12/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Assocation of Counsel (Morris Law Group as counsel for the Real Parties' in Interest).16-25098
08/12/2016MotionFiled Motion to File Portions of Real Parties' Answer to Petitiion for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus and Portions of the Supplemental Appendix Under Seal.16-25099
08/12/2016Petition/WritFiled Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (Redacted).16-25100
08/12/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Volume 1.16-25101
08/12/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Volume 2.16-25102
08/12/2016OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
08/24/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, under seal, the unredacted answer to the petition and volumes 1 and 2 of the appendix to the answer to the petition, provisionally received in this court on August 16, 2016. fn1[The redacted answer to the petition was filed on August 12, 2016.]16-26397
08/24/2016Petition/WritFiled Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (SEALED).
08/24/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Volume 1 (SEALED).
08/24/2016AppendixFiled Appendix to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Volume 2 (SEALED).
08/30/2016MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to Redact Portions of its Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus.16-26883
08/30/2016MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to File Documents APP 0722-APP 0733 of its Supplemental Appendix Under Seal.16-26885
08/30/2016AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Wynn Resorts, Limited's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus.16-26886
09/07/2016MotionFiled Motion to Strike Footnote 8 in Petitioner's Reply Brief and to Publicly Admonish or Sanction Wynn Resorts for Presenting a False Statement of Material Fact to the Court and Request to File Exhibits A (Redacted).16-27814
09/07/2016MotionFiled Motion to File Portions of Motion to Strike Footnote 8 in Petitioner's Reply Brief and to Publicly Admonish or Sanction Wynn Resorts for Presenting a False Statement of Material Fact to the Court, and Its Exhibits Under Seal.16-27815
09/19/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opposition to Motion to Strike Footnote 8 due: September 30, 2016.16-28937
10/03/2016MotionFiled Response to Motion to Strike Footnote 8 in Petitioner's Reply Brief and to Publicly Admonish or Sanction Wynn Resorts For Presenting a False Statement of Material Fact to the Court And Countermotion.16-30652
10/11/2016MotionFiled Aruze Parties' Oppostion to Countermotion to Strike Portions of Volume 2 of Appendix to Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus.16-31553
10/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall file the redacted reply received on August 30, 2016, and shall file under seal the unredacted reply and Volume V of the supplemental appendix, both received on September 6, 2016. Real parties in interest have filed a motion to strike footnote 8 from petitioner's reply and for petitioner to be publicly admonished or sanctioned. This court will substitute the amended language in footnote 8 as stated in petitioner's response at pages 1-2. We deny the motions to the extent that they request admonishment or sanctions and to strike the portions of the appendix to the answer. fn1[we grant real parties' motions to file under seal portions of the motion to strike and exhibits to the motion. The clerk shall file under seal the unredacted motion and exhibits received on September 12, 2016.]16-31831
10/12/2016Petition/WritFiled Wynn Resorts' Redacted Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. (FILED PER ORDER 10/12/16).16-31834
10/12/2016Petition/WritFiled Wynn Resorts' Unredacted Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus (SEALED). (FILED PER ORDER 10/12/16).
10/12/2016AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Wynn Resorts, Limited's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus. Volume V (SEALED). (FILED PER ORDER 10/12/16).
10/12/2016MotionFiled Motion to Strike Footnote 8 in Petitioner's Reply Brief and to Publicly Admonish or Sanction Wynn Resorts for Presenting a False Statement of Material Fact to the Court and Request to File Exhibits A (SEALED). (FILED PER ORDER 10/12/16
12/21/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, February 6, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.16-39737
01/03/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Oral argument in this case has been scheduled for February 6, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. The court has also scheduled oral argument in Wynn Resorts, Ltd v. Eighth Judicial District Court, No. 70452, on that same date at 10:30 a.m. Because these cases involve the same parties, it is the court's intent that the two cases be argued together. Petitioners and the real parties in interest shall each have 30 minutes for argument, during which they shall address both cases.17-00021
01/11/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order. These cases were previously scheduled for oral argument on Monday, February 6, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Docket No. 70500 and at 10:30 a.m. in Docket No. 70452. The time for argument is hereby changed, and oral argument before the en banc court will be held on Monday, February 6, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. for Docket No. 70500 and 10:00 a.m. in Docket No. 70452. Nos. 70050/70452.17-00991
01/24/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-02543
02/03/2017Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Las Vegas Review Journal's Requesting Permission for Photo and Video Coverage of Oral Argument being Held February 6, 2017.17-04013
02/03/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Sean Whaley of the Las Vegas Review Journal is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 9:30 a.m.17-04029
02/06/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
05/08/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion To Extend The District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition And Rule 27(e) Emergency Motion For Interim Extension Of Stay.17-15063
05/08/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Aruze Parties's Notice of Intent to Oppose Wynn Resorts Limited's Motion to Extend the District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27 (e) Emergency Motion for Interim Extension of Stay.17-15074
05/16/2017MotionFiled Aruze Parties's Opposition to Wynn Reports Limited's Motion to Extend the District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 24(e) Emergency Motion for Interim Extension of Stay.17-16276
05/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay. The district court's May 3, 2016, "Order Regarding (1) Motions to Compel Freeh Documents and (2) In-Cameral Review of Freeh Group Documents" shall be stayed pending further order of this court.17-16426
06/29/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address (Morris Law Group).17-21694
07/27/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted (Docket No. 70050); and petition granted in part, with instructions (Docket No. 70452)." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition precluding the district court from compelling the production of the attorney-client privileged Brownstein Hyatt documents (Docket no. 70050). We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition directing the district court to consider, consistent with this opinion, whether the work-product privilege applies (Docket no. 70452). Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Concurring: Cherry/Hardesty/Douglas/Gibbons/Stiglich. fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering and the Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justices, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. Nos. 70050/70452.17-24949
07/27/2017WritFiled Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the order mailed to Todd Bice for service upon Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez.17-25005
08/07/2017WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez on August 1, 2017.17-26133
08/21/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-27980
08/21/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/21/2017Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 09/15/17. Order Regarding (1) Defendants' Motion to Set a Date Certain on Production of Pre-Redemption Freeh Documents; and (2) Defendants' Motion to Overrule Work Product Claims as to Pre-Redemption Freeh Documents and to Compel Immediate Production.17-32022