Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70458
Short Caption:KING, P.E. VS. ST. CLAIRCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV 20112Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/08/2016 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/07/2017 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/07/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
05/25/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)16-16465
05/25/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.16-16467
05/26/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant:15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:16-16590
06/09/2016Transcript RequestFiled Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/05/16. To Court Reporter: Nicole Alexander.16-18056
06/09/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/05/16, 04/11/16. To Court Reporter: Nicole Alexander.16-18100
06/14/2016Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.16-18559
06/21/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Nicole Alexander stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/05/16.16-19313
06/22/2016Transcript RequestFiled Amended Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/05/16, 04/11/16. To Court Reporter: Nicole Alexander & Shannon Taylor.16-19470
07/15/2016MotionFiled Request for Settlement Conference.16-22121
08/04/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant respondent's unopposed motion to refer this appeal to the court's settlement program. Accordingly, we stay resolution of this appeal and refer this matter to the settlement program.16-24192
08/08/2016Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg.16-24533
08/31/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 6, 2016 at 9:00 am.16-27170
10/07/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.16-31347
10/11/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Court Reporter Shannon L. Taylor's Court Reporter Certificate due: 30 days. Appellant(s): 60 days opening brief and appendix. fn1[The clerk shall attach a copy of that transcript request form to this order.]16-31616
10/27/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shannon L. Taylor stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/11/16.16-33734
12/09/2016BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.16-38238
12/09/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume I.16-38257
12/09/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume II.16-38259
01/06/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: January 23, 2017.17-00444
01/24/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-02611
02/21/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: March 9, 2017.17-05912
03/09/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-08038
03/09/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/20/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Removal of Attorney.17-13248
06/26/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-21040
09/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 7, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.17-32459
10/23/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-36260
11/07/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
11/13/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Errata to Respondent Rodney St. Clair's Answering Brief.17-39054
03/29/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 18. EN BANC18-12049
04/24/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-15650
04/24/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/04/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 25, 2018.18-15650