Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70542
Short Caption:RICHARD (DVONTAE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C308258Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/15/2018 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:02/15/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/10/2016Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/10/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)16-18244
06/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.16-18246
06/13/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Redesignation of Appeal.16-18378
06/14/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Corrected Notice of Redesignation of Appeal.16-18472
06/20/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/27/15. To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt.16-19091
06/20/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/12/15. To Court Reporter: Brenda Schroeder.16-19092
06/20/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/22/16, 02/23/16, 02/24/16, 02/25/16, 02/26/16, 02/31/16, 05/04/16, 05/25/16. To Court Reporter: Judy Chappell.16-19094
06/20/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/03/15, 08/05/15, 08/12/15, 08/19/15, 09/02/15, 02/18/16. To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard.16-19095
06/21/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (Second NOA)16-19373
06/24/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/27/15.16-19824
06/30/2016Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.16-20497
10/13/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.16-31937
10/18/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 14, 2016.16-32417
11/14/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Additional Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.16-35345
11/23/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 30, 2016.16-36528
12/01/2016MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Third Request).16-37176
12/07/2016MotionFiled Motion for Additional Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Fourth Request).16-37806
12/14/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 4, 2017.16-38766
01/05/2017MotionFiled Motion for Additional Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Fifth Request).17-00357
01/11/2017MotionFiled Amended Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (5th Request).17-01091
01/17/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 20, 2017.17-01590
01/20/2017MotionFiled Motion for Additional Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Seventh Request).17-02289
01/20/2017MotionFiled Amended Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (7th Request).17-02290
02/01/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 6, 2017.17-03646
03/07/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Additional Time to File the Opening Brief By One Day (Eighth Request).17-07604
03/07/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I.17-07606
03/07/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II.17-07607
03/07/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III.17-07608
03/07/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV.17-07609
03/08/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Supplement to Motion for Additional Time to File the Opening Brief by Three Days.17-07750
03/17/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk shall file the opening brief received on March 9, 2017. Answering brief due: 30 days.17-09005
03/17/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-09006
04/17/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).17-12587
04/17/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: May 17, 2017.17-12594
05/17/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-16555
06/19/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Reply Brief.17-20173
06/27/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: July 31, 2017.17-21334
08/21/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No Reply Filed.
11/28/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-40929
01/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, February 15, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.18-01157
01/31/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-04218
02/15/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel MC/RP/LS.
08/23/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cherry/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Cherry/Parraguirre. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 64. SNP18-MC/RP/LS18-32859
09/17/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-36148
09/17/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/01/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 21, 2018.18-36148